United States of America v. Jackson et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Brian P Jackson, State of Washington Department of Revenue, King County, James J Jackson, III and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2018cv01067
Filed: July 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 10/3/2018, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (cc: James Jackson via U.S. Mail) (KERR)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting parties' #12 Joint Motion to Dismiss Brian P. Jackson, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)(Brian P Jackson terminated.) (cc: James Jackson, Brian Jackson via USPS)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Extension of Time to Answer re parties' #6 Stipulation: Mr. Jackson allowed an extension until 9/21/2018 to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (cc: James Jackson, Brian Jackson via USPS)
August 27, 2018 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party , Brian P. Jackson, filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/27/2018, (Tran, Yen)
August 17, 2018 Filing 11 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Brian P Jackson on 8/4/2018 (Tran, Yen)
August 17, 2018 Filing 10 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. on 8/3/2018 (Tran, Yen)
August 17, 2018 Filing 9 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant State of Washington Department of Revenue on 8/3/2018 (Tran, Yen)
August 17, 2018 Filing 8 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant King County on 8/2/2018 (Tran, Yen)
August 17, 2018 Filing 7 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant James J Jackson, III on 8/1/2018 (Tran, Yen)
August 17, 2018 Filing 6 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by parties (Tran, Yen)
August 16, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Donivan R Irby added to party State of Washington Department of Revenue(pty:dft) by State of Washington Department of Revenue.(Irby, Donivan)
August 9, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Margaret A Pahl on behalf of Defendant King County. (Pahl, Margaret)
August 6, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Plaintiff United States of America. (Tran, Yen)
July 23, 2018 Filing 2 Summons(es) electronically issued as to defendant(s) JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Brian P. Jackson, James J. Jackson, III, King County, State of Washington Department of Revenue. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(DJ)
July 23, 2018 Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (DJ)
July 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Attorney Yen Jeannette Tran added to party United States of America(pty:pla), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons -James J. Jackson, #3 Summons -King County, #4 Summons -State of WA Dept. of Revenue, #5 Summons -JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., #6 Summons -Brian P. Jackson)(Tran, Yen) (Fee Waived)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Jackson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian P Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Washington Department of Revenue
Represented By: Donivan R Irby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King County
Represented By: Margaret A Pahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James J Jackson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Yen Jeannette Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?