Keck et al v City of Seattle

Plaintiff: Michael R Jeppesen, Bradley A Keck, Herbert W Wilson and Scott A Remillard
Defendant: City of Seattle
Case Number: 2:2018cv01146
Filed: August 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Snohomish
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15:5
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2018 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: 4-8 days. Jury Trial is set for 11/4/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 15106 before Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Joinder of Parties due by 10/17/2018, Amended Pleadings due by 5/8/2019, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 5/8/2019, Discovery completed by 7/7/2019, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 7/21/2019, Dispositive motions due by 8/6/2019, Motions in Limine due by 10/7/2019, Pretrial Order due by 10/23/2019, Trial briefs to be submitted by 10/30/2019, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions and trial exhibits due by 10/30/2019 (KERR)
September 18, 2018 Filing 11 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 4-8. (Seals, Rachel)
September 17, 2018 Attorney Stephen A Teller for Michael R Jeppesen, Bradley A Keck, Scott A Remillard, Herbert W Wilson added; per #9 Notice of Attorney Association, #10 Praecipe to Attach Document. (SWT)
September 17, 2018 Filing 10 PRAECIPE to attach document Notice of Association of Counsel re #9 Notice of Attorney Association by Plaintiffs Michael R Jeppesen, Bradley A Keck, Scott A Remillard, Herbert W Wilson (Attachments: #1 Notice of Association of Counsel)(Amies, Sara)
September 14, 2018 NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The #9 Notice of Attorney Association was improperly signed by Stephen A. Teller. As such, one or more attorneys were not added to the case and will not receive future notices until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. Please file corrected signature page using Praecipe to Attach event and link to original filing. (SWT)
September 14, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Sara B Amies on behalf of Plaintiffs Michael R Jeppesen, Bradley A Keck, Scott A Remillard, Herbert W Wilson. (Amies, Sara)
September 13, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by City of Seattle.(Seals, Rachel)
September 13, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Paul A Olsen on behalf of Defendant City of Seattle. (Olsen, Paul)
September 4, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Reba Weiss for Plaintiffs Michael R Jeppesen, Bradley A Keck, Scott A Remillard, Herbert W Wilson from 10/30/18 - 11/30/18. (Weiss, Reba)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 9/18/2018, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
August 17, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Rachel Seals on behalf of Defendant City of Seattle. (Seals, Rachel)
August 10, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Reba Weiss for Plaintiffs Michael R Jeppesen, Bradley A Keck, Scott A Remillard, Herbert W Wilson from 9/18/18-9/25/18. (Weiss, Reba)
August 6, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant (CDA)
August 6, 2018 Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (CDA)
August 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant (s) scott remillard, Herbert Hoover Wilson, Michael Jeppesen City of Seattle with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5422507), filed by Bradley A. Keck. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Weiss, Reba) Modified on 8/6/2018 to correct name of defendant (CDA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keck et al v City of Seattle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael R Jeppesen
Represented By: Reba Weiss
Represented By: Stephen A Teller
Represented By: Sara B Amies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley A Keck
Represented By: Reba Weiss
Represented By: Stephen A Teller
Represented By: Sara B Amies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert W Wilson
Represented By: Reba Weiss
Represented By: Stephen A Teller
Represented By: Sara B Amies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott A Remillard
Represented By: Reba Weiss
Represented By: Stephen A Teller
Represented By: Sara B Amies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Seattle
Represented By: Rachel Seals
Represented By: Paul A Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?