Martinez Patterson v. AT&T Services Inc
Plaintiff: Maria Del Carmen Martinez Patterson
Defendant: AT&T Services Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv01180
Filed: August 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez: Length of Trial: *7 days*. Jury Trial is set for 1/25/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Amended Pleadings due by 2/25/2020, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 7/29/2020, Motions due by 8/28/2020, Discovery completed by 9/28/2020, Dispositive motions due by 10/27/2020, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 12/11/2020, Motions in Limine due by 12/28/2020, Pretrial Order due by 1/13/2021, Trial briefs to be submitted by 1/20/2021, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 1/20/2021. (LC)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Joint MOTION New Scheduling Order re #37 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney,,,, Case Stayed,,,, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,,,, Add and Terminate Attorneys,,, , filed by Plaintiff Maria Del Carmen Martinez Patterson. Noting Date 1/27/2020, (Johnson, Chalmers)
January 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Chalmers C Johnson on behalf of Plaintiff Maria Del Carmen Martinez Patterson. (Johnson, Chalmers)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 EXHIBIT K, M and R re #22 Declaration by Plaintiff Maria Del Carmen Martinez Patterson (Blankenship, Scott)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting Plaintiff's Counsel's #31 Motion to Withdraw. Attorneys Scott Crispin Greco Blankenship and Charlotte Sanders and the Blankenship Law Firm, PLLC are allowed to withdraw from this matter and no longer represent Plaintiff. Plaintiff's Request for Stay is GRANTED IN PART. All further proceedings are stayed until January 12, 2020, including all formal discovery. All pending deadlines are vacated to be reset when Plaintiff appears with new counsel or when the stay expires, whichever occurs first. Within fifteen (15) days after the stay is lifted, counsel for parties shall meet and confer regarding proposed deadlines and submit a stipulated motion of these proposed deadlines to the Court for consideration. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM) cc: Plaintiff via first class mail
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting in part Plaintiff's #21 Motion to Compel signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (TH)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Re: Motions to Seal. Plaintiff's Motion to Seal (Dkt. #20 ) is DENIED. Within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall re-file the exhibits (Dkt. #23 ) with redactions of identifying information in the performance reviews, Ex. M, and any identifying information or otherwise sensitive material in the internal message exchange, Ex. R; Defendant's Motion to Seal (Dkt. #27 ) is GRANTED and the filing shall remain sealed. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (TH) Modified on 10/21/2019 to correct typo(MET).
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Supplemental DECLARATION of Scott C.G. Blankenship filed by Plaintiff Maria Del Carmen Martinez Patterson re #31 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Blankenship, Scott)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Maria Del Carmen Martinez Patterson, TO RESPONSE to #31 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Blankenship, Scott)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 RESPONSE, by Defendant AT&T Services Inc, to #31 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Payton, Gwendolyn)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , filed by Plaintiff Maria Del Carmen Martinez Patterson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Scott C.G. Blankenship, #3 Declaration of Leland Ripley, #4 Declaration of Maria del Carmen Martinez-Patterson) Noting Date 9/27/2019, (Blankenship, Scott)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Second DECLARATION of Charlotte Sanders filed by Plaintiff Maria Del Carmen Martinez Patterson re #21 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Sanders, Charlotte)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Maria Del Carmen Martinez Patterson, TO RESPONSE to #21 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses (Sanders, Charlotte)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant AT&T Services Inc re #27 MOTION to Seal EXHIBITS A-1, B-1, B-2 AND G TO AT&TS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL, #25 Declaration, #24 Response to Motion, #26 Declaration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B-1, #2 Exhibit B-2, #3 Exhibit G)(Payton, Gwendolyn)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION to Seal EXHIBITS A-1, B-1, B-2 AND G TO AT&TS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL, filed by Defendant AT&T Services Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/29/2019, (Payton, Gwendolyn)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 DECLARATION of CURTIS READ filed by Defendant AT&T Services Inc re #21 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B-1 - B-2)(Payton, Gwendolyn)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 DECLARATION of CHRISTOPHER J. LINTNER filed by Defendant AT&T Services Inc re #21 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1)(Payton, Gwendolyn)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 RESPONSE, by Defendant AT&T Services Inc, to #21 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C-G)(Payton, Gwendolyn)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibits K, M and R to the Declaration of Charlotte Sanders iso Motion to Compel Discovery Responses by Plaintiff Maria Del Carmen Martinez Patterson re #20 MOTION to Seal Exhibits K, M and R to the Declaration of Charlotte Sanders iso Motion to Compel Discovery Responses, #22 Declaration (Sanders, Charlotte)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 DECLARATION of Charlotte Sanders filed by Plaintiff Maria Del Carmen Martinez Patterson re #21 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Sanders, Charlotte)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses, filed by Plaintiff Maria Del Carmen Martinez Patterson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/2/2019, (Sanders, Charlotte)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION to Seal Exhibits K, M and R to the Declaration of Charlotte Sanders iso #21 Motion to Compel Discovery Responses, filed by Plaintiff Maria Del Carmen Martinez Patterson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/2/2019, (Sanders, Charlotte) Modified on 7/19/2019 to add link to motion to compel (PM).
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PROTECTIVE ORDER re parties' #18 Stipulated MOTION, by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SWT)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Stipulated MOTION for a Protective Order, filed by Plaintiff Maria Del Carmen Martinez Patterson. (Attachments: #1 Redline of Proposed Stipulated Protective Order) Noting Date 2/27/2019, (Sanders, Charlotte)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Scott Crispin Greco Blankenship. Filed by Plaintiff Maria Del Carmen Martinez Patterson. (Blankenship, Scott)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez: Length of Trial: *7 days*. Jury Trial is set for 3/9/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joinder of Parties due by 1/2/2019, Amended Pleadings due by 1/2/2019, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 9/11/2019, Motions due by 10/11/2019, Discovery completed by 11/12/2019, Dispositive motions due by 12/10/2019, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 1/24/2020, Motions in Limine due by 2/10/2020, Pretrial Order due by 2/26/2020, Trial briefs to be submitted by 3/4/2020, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 3/4/2020. (LC)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent AT&T Inc., Corporate Parent AT&T Teleholdings, Inc. for AT&T Services Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by AT&T Services Inc (Abastillas, Noelle)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 7 days. Filed by Plaintiff Maria Del Carmen Martinez Patterson.(Blankenship, Scott)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by AT&T Services Inc.(Payton, Gwendolyn)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AMENDED ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 11/21/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 11/7/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/14/2017. (LC)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Noelle Abastillas for Defendant AT&T Services Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #5 Motion to Re-issue or Modify Case Scheduling Order. The Court shall re-issue its Case Scheduling Order in this matter. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Susan W Pangborn for Defendant AT&T Services Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Noelle Abastillas FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant AT&T Services Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5491539 (Payton, Gwendolyn) 10/1/18 Correct phone number for PHV Applicant is 404-815-6056(DS).
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Susan W. Pangborn FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant AT&T Services Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5491376 (Payton, Gwendolyn)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Gwendolyn C. Payton on behalf of Defendant AT&T Services Inc. (Payton, Gwendolyn)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION Re-Issue or Modify Case Scheduling Order , filed by Plaintiff Maria Del Carmen Martinez Patterson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/26/2018, (Sanders, Charlotte)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on AT&T Services, INC on 9/18/2018, filed by Plaintiff Maria Del Carmen Martinez Patterson. (Sanders, Charlotte)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 10/1/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 9/17/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/24/2018. (LC)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant AT&T Services Inc (CDA)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (CDA)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against defendant(s) AT&T Services Inc with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5430352) Attorney Scott Crispin Greco Blankenship added to party Maria Del Carmen Martinez Patterson(pty:pla), filed by Maria Del Carmen Martinez Patterson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Blankenship, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez Patterson v. AT&T Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Del Carmen Martinez Patterson
Represented By: Scott Crispin Greco Blankenship
Represented By: Charlotte Sanders
Represented By: Chalmers C Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Services Inc
Represented By: Susan W Pangborn
Represented By: Gwendolyn C. Payton
Represented By: Noelle Abastillas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?