Farley v. Adecco USA, Inc et al

Plaintiff: Virginia Farley
Defendant: Restaurant Revolution Technologies, Inc., Adecco USA Inc, Restaurant Revolution Technologies, Inc and Adecco USA, Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv01185
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2018 ***Civil Case Terminated. See plaintiff's #13 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (SWT)
September 26, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff Virginia Farley (Hanley, Elizabeth)
September 26, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Peter H Nohle on behalf of Defendant Adecco USA, Inc. (Nohle, Peter)
September 19, 2018 Filing 11 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Restaurant Revolution Technologies, Inc on 9/6/2018 (Thompson, Jason)
September 11, 2018 Reset Deadline: Having considered the parties' #10 Stipulated MOTION, and finding good cause, it is ordered that Defendant Adecco may file and serve its response to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before 9/26/2018. Neither the extension, nor the parties' Stipulation shall operate to prejudice or waive Defendant Adecco's ability to assert any defenses or other rights in response to Plaintiff's Complaint, with the exception being that the statute of limitations defense will not be asserted, as agreed in the parties' stipulation. (VE)
September 11, 2018 NOTE re : Document #10 . Appearance of attorney Peter Nohle is not proper, and notices of electronic filing will not be sent until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. (TH)
September 10, 2018 Filing 10 Joint Stipulated MOTION to Extent Time for Responding to Complaint, filed by Defendant Adecco USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulated Motion to Extend Time for Responding to Complaint) Noting Date 9/10/2018, (Nohle, Peter)
September 5, 2018 Filing 9 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Adecco USA, Inc on 8/20/2018 (Thompson, Jason)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Rod M Johnston for Plaintiff Virginia Farley, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jason J Thompson for Plaintiff Virginia Farley, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 16, 2018 Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Rod Johnston FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Virginia Farley (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5436700 (Hanley, Elizabeth)
August 16, 2018 Filing 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jason Thompson FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Virginia Farley (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5436689 (Hanley, Elizabeth)
August 16, 2018 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
August 14, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER: Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (DJ)
August 14, 2018 Filing 2 Summons(es) electronically issued as to defendant(s) Adecco USA, Inc, Restaurant Revolution Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(DJ)
August 14, 2018 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (DJ)
August 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT COLLECTIVE AND CLASS ACTION against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5431663), filed by Virginia Farley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Adecco USA, Inc., #3 Summons Restaurant Revolution Technologies, Inc.)(Hanley, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farley v. Adecco USA, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Restaurant Revolution Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adecco USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Restaurant Revolution Technologies, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adecco USA, Inc
Represented By: Peter H Nohle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Farley
Represented By: Jason J Thompson
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Hanley
Represented By: Rod M Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?