Goldberg et al v. Ten Bridges, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Nicole Goldberg and Michael Goldberg
Defendant: Ten Bridges LLC, Boeing Employees Credit Union and Ten Bridges, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv01227
Filed: August 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2018 Filing 21 Plaintiffs ANSWER to #12 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Michael Goldberg, Nicole Goldberg.(Franzel, Ian)
October 6, 2018 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Ten Bridges, LLC with JURY DEMAND, filed by Nicole Goldberg, Michael Goldberg.(Franzel, Ian)
September 21, 2018 Filing 19 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Michael Goldberg, Nicole Goldberg, TO RESPONSE to #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Preventing Disbursement of Surplus Proceeds (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 9.21 Decl. of N. Goldberg, #2 Exhibit Ex. A to Decl. of Goldberg, #3 Exhibit Ex. B to Decl. of Goldberg)(Franzel, Ian)
September 19, 2018 Filing 18 PRAECIPE to attach document re #16 Declaration by Defendant Ten Bridges, LLC (Kleinberg, Alexander)
September 19, 2018 Filing 17 PRAECIPE to attach document re #15 Declaration by Defendant Ten Bridges, LLC (Kleinberg, Alexander)
September 18, 2018 NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The #15 Declaration of Matt Cox, and #16 Declaration of Demian Heald were improperly signed. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. Please file corrected signature page using Praecipe to Attach event and link to original filing. (PM)
September 17, 2018 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Demian Heald filed by Defendant Ten Bridges, LLC re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Preventing Disbursement of Surplus Proceeds (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-8)(Kleinberg, Alexander)
September 17, 2018 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Matt Cox filed by Defendant Ten Bridges, LLC re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Preventing Disbursement of Surplus Proceeds (Kleinberg, Alexander)
September 17, 2018 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Alexander S. Kleinberg filed by Defendant Ten Bridges, LLC re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Preventing Disbursement of Surplus Proceeds (Kleinberg, Alexander)
September 17, 2018 Filing 13 RESPONSE, by Defendant Ten Bridges, LLC, to #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Preventing Disbursement of Surplus Proceeds. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Kleinberg, Alexander)
September 17, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint; Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Michael Goldberg, Nicole Goldberg by Ten Bridges, LLC.(Kleinberg, Alexander)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 10/19/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 10/5/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/12/2018, by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW)
August 30, 2018 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #10 Verification of State Court Records: edited text to include true title of document (Delcaration of Alex S. Kleinberg) (PM)
August 29, 2018 Filing 10 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS/DECLARATION of ALEX S. KLEINBERG in support of #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Ten Bridges, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1 - 18)(Kleinberg, Alexander) Modified on 8/30/2018: edited text to include true title of document (PM).
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re: parties' #7 Stipulated Motion. Under FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), Boeing Employees Credit Union is dismissed from this action with prejudice and without an award of fees or costs. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
August 28, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Preventing Disbursement of Surplus Proceeds, filed by Plaintiffs Michael Goldberg, Nicole Goldberg. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit The Declaration of Nicole Goldberg in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction dated 7/30/18, #2 Exhibit Ex. A to The Declaration of Nicole Goldberg: dialogue between Ms. Goldberg and Ten Bridges Private Investigator, #3 Exhibit Ex. B to The Declaration of Nicole Goldberg: 1.19.18 Email to Ten Bridges, #4 Exhibit Ex. C to The Declaration of Nicole Goldberg: Demand Letter of 1.20.18 to Ten Bridges, #5 Exhibit Ex. D to The Declaration of Nicole Goldberg: Vantage and Willamette Articles on Surplus Proceeds, #6 Exhibit Attachment 2 - The Declaration of Ian Franzel on Recorded Documents and Court Records, dated 7/31/18, #7 Exhibit Ex. A to The Declaration of Ian Franzel: Quit Claim Deed from M Coop to Ten Bridges, #8 Exhibit Ex. B to The Declaration of Ian Franzel: Order of Disbursement in Groves/Coop Matter, #9 Exhibit Ex. C to The Declaration of Ian Franzel: Order Denying motion to Disburse, #10 Exhibit Ex. F to The Declaration of Ian Franzel: 1.17.18 Quit Claim Deed, #11 Exhibit Ex. G to The Declaration of Ian Franzel: Michael Golberg QCD of 1.19.18, #12 Exhibit Ex. H to The Declaration of Ian Franzel: Order for Zero Month Redemption, #13 Exhibit Ex. I to The Declaration of Ian Franzel: Note for Motion Docket for First Motion, #14 Exhibit Ex. J to The Declaration of Ian Franzel: Ten Bridges First Motion to Disburse, #15 Exhibit Ex. K to The Declaration of Ian Franzel: Decl. of Service of 3.9 motion to disburse hearing, #16 Exhibit Ex. L to The Declaration of Ian Franzel: Ten Bridges' 7.16.18 Reply, #17 Exhibit Ex. M to The Declaration of Ian Franzel: Ten Bridges' Reply of 4.11.18, #18 Exhibit Ex. N to The Declaration of Ian Franzel: Ten Bridges' Second Motion to Disburse, #19 Exhibit Ex. O to The Declaration of Ian Franzel: Motion to disburse 74000 to Ten Bridges, #20 Exhibit Ex. P to The Declaration of Ian Franzel: Carter Deed to Ten Bridges., #21 Exhibit Ex. Q to The Declaration of Ian Franzel: Sheriff's Deed for 13705 Property, #22 Exhibit Ex. R to The Declaration of Ian Franzel: King County Assessors Report for 31920, #23 Exhibit Ex. S to The Declaration of Ian Franzel: King County Recorders Deed Entries for Ten Bridges) Noting Date 9/21/2018, (Franzel, Ian)
August 27, 2018 Filing 7 Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss BECU, filed by Defendant Boeing Employees Credit Union. Noting Date 8/27/2018, (Hade, Kellen)
August 24, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kellen Andrew Hade on behalf of Defendant Boeing Employees Credit Union. (Hade, Kellen)
August 24, 2018 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Ten Bridges, LLC (Kleinberg, Alexander)
August 24, 2018 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by William M. McCool. Case reassigned to Judge Ricardo S. Martinez for all further proceedings. Hon. Brian A Tsuchida no longer assigned to case. cc to RSM. (AE)
August 21, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before the Hon. Brian A. Tsuchida if this form is not returned by 8/28/2018. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KMP)
August 21, 2018 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re: receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (DJ)
August 21, 2018 Hon. Brian A. Tsuchida added. (DJ)
August 21, 2018 NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant(s) Ten Bridges, LLC must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 8/28/2018. (DJ)
August 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 18-2-17393-1 SEA; (Receipt # 0981-5440817) Attorney Alexander Sether Kleinberg added to party Ten Bridges LLC(pty:dft), filed by Ten Bridges LLC. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 List of counsel, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kleinberg, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goldberg et al v. Ten Bridges, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Goldberg
Represented By: Ian P Franzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Goldberg
Represented By: Ian P Franzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ten Bridges LLC
Represented By: Alexander Sether Kleinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boeing Employees Credit Union
Represented By: Kellen Andrew Hade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ten Bridges, LLC
Represented By: Alexander Sether Kleinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?