Adams et al v. Corr Cronin Michelson Baumgardner Fogg and Moore PLLP et al
Plaintiff: Hollystone Holdings Inc, Erika M Adams and Sam A Adams
Defendant: Guy Michelson and Corr Cronin Michelson Baumgardner Fogg and Moore PLLP
Petitioner: Erika Adams and Sam Adams
Interested Party: Bankruptcy Withdrawal of Reference (SEA) and Bankruptcy Withdrawal of Ref (SEA)
Case Number: 2:2018cv01237
Filed: August 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, AND EARLY SETTLEMENT; FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 11/9/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/23/2018, Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan due by 11/23/2018. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER granting plaintiffs' unopposed #1 Motion to Withdraw Reference. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (PM)
September 5, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Nicholas Ryan-Lang on behalf of Defendants Corr Cronin Michelson Baumgardner Fogg and Moore PLLP, Guy Michelson. (Ryan-Lang, Nicholas)
August 30, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Keith David Petrak for Defendants Corr Cronin Michelson Baumgardner Fogg and Moore PLLP, Guy Michelson from October 5-12, 2018. (Petrak, Keith)
August 30, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Corr Cronin Michelson Baumgardner Fogg and Moore PLLP (Petrak, Keith)
August 27, 2018 NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) Hollystone Holdings Inc must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 9/4/2018. (DJ)
August 23, 2018 Filing 2 Letter from Clerk's Office to counsel advising of District Court case number, judge assignment re #1 MOTION to Withdraw the Reference (DJ)
August 23, 2018 Judge Thomas S. Zilly added to case. (DJ)
August 22, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION to Withdraw the Reference, filed by Movants Erika Adams, Sam Adams, Hollystone Holdings Inc. (Attachments: #1 Record on Appeal) Noting Date 8/24/2018, (No Fee Required)(Bankruptcy Clerk (Sea), )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams et al v. Corr Cronin Michelson Baumgardner Fogg and Moore PLLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hollystone Holdings Inc
Represented By: Brian Joel Waid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erika M Adams
Represented By: Brian Joel Waid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam A Adams
Represented By: Brian Joel Waid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Erika Adams
Represented By: Brian Joel Waid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sam Adams
Represented By: Brian Joel Waid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Bankruptcy Withdrawal of Reference (SEA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Bankruptcy Withdrawal of Ref (SEA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guy Michelson
Represented By: Bradley S Keller
Represented By: Keith David Petrak
Represented By: Nicholas Ryan-Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corr Cronin Michelson Baumgardner Fogg and Moore PLLP
Represented By: Bradley S Keller
Represented By: Keith David Petrak
Represented By: Nicholas Ryan-Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?