Miranda v. United States of America

Petitioner: Frankie Manuel Miranda
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2018cv01241
Filed: August 21, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 2, 2018 United States' Answer to Motion to Vacate Under 28 USC 2255 re #5 Response to 2255 Motion NOTED on motion calendar; Noting Date 10/26/2018, (SWT)
October 2, 2018 7 SEALED DOCUMENT EXHIBIT D by Respondent United States of America re #6 MOTION to Seal EXHIBIT D TO GOVERNMENTS ANSWER OPPOSING MOTION FILED UNDER 28 U.S.C. 2255, #5 Response to 2255 Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D)(Hobbs, Stephen)
October 2, 2018 6 MOTION to Seal EXHIBIT D TO GOVERNMENTS ANSWER OPPOSING MOTION FILED UNDER 28 U.S.C. 2255, filed by Respondent United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/12/2018, (Hobbs, Stephen)
October 2, 2018 5 RESPONSE, by Respondent United States of America, to #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit E)(Hobbs, Stephen)
September 5, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER Directing the United States to Answer 2255 Petition signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (TH)
August 23, 2018 2 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (SG)
August 21, 2018 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255), related to criminal case: 16-cr-186-RSL., filed by Frankie Manuel Miranda.(SG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miranda v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Stephen Paul Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Frankie Manuel Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?