Hoskins v. American Civil Liberties Union Foundation et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Andre Hoskins
Defendant: Teresa Selfe, Seattle Public Library, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, Seattle Office for Civil Rights, Priya Wilson and City of Seattle
Case Number: 2:2018cv01252
Filed: August 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Scott P Kennedy for Defendants City of Seattle, Seattle Office for Civil Rights, Seattle Public Library. (Kennedy, Scott)
February 5, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Tobi Marie Andrews on behalf of Defendants City of Seattle, Seattle Office for Civil Rights, Seattle Public Library. (Andrews, Tobi)
December 17, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Scott P Kennedy for Defendants City of Seattle, Seattle Office for Civil Rights, Seattle Public Library from 12/31/18-1/11/19. (Kennedy, Scott)
November 30, 2018 Filing 33 REPLY, filed by Defendants City of Seattle, Seattle Office for Civil Rights, Seattle Public Library, TO RESPONSE to 30 MOTION for More Definite Statement (Kennedy, Scott)
November 26, 2018 Filing 32 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Andre Hoskins, to 30 MOTION for More Definite Statement . (Attachments: # 1 Notice, # 2 Certificate of Service)(SWT)
November 9, 2018 Filing 31 DECLARATION of Scott Kennedy filed by Defendants City of Seattle, Seattle Office for Civil Rights, Seattle Public Library re 30 MOTION for More Definite Statement (Kennedy, Scott)
November 9, 2018 Filing 30 MOTION for More Definite Statement , filed by Defendants City of Seattle, Seattle Office for Civil Rights, Seattle Public Library. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/30/2018, (Kennedy, Scott)
October 26, 2018 Filing 29 REPLY, filed by Defendant American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, TO RESPONSE to 23 MOTION to Dismiss (RENEWED) (Kipling, Michael)
October 25, 2018 Filing 28 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Andre Hoskins, to 23 MOTION to Dismiss (RENEWED). (Attachments: # 1 Motion to Response to ACLU Response)(PM)
October 15, 2018 Filing 27 RESPONSE, by Defendants City of Seattle, Seattle Office for Civil Rights, Seattle Public Library, to 22 MOTION to Request Mediation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Scott P. Kennedy)(Kennedy, Scott)
October 2, 2018 Noting Date Set: 22 MOTION to Request Mediation filed by Plaintiff Andre Hoskins is noted for 10/19/2018, pursuant to LCR 7(d)(3). (cc: Plaintiff via first class mail) (VE)
October 2, 2018 Filing 26 RESPONSE, by Defendant American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, to 22 MOTION to Request Mediation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kipling, Michael)
October 2, 2018 Filing 25 REPLY, filed by Defendant American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, TO RESPONSE to 9 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kipling, Michael)
October 2, 2018 Filing 24 DECLARATION of Michael E. Kipling filed by Defendant American Civil Liberties Union Foundation re 23 MOTION to Dismiss (RENEWED) (Kipling, Michael)
October 2, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss (RENEWED), filed by Defendant American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/26/2018, (Kipling, Michael)
September 28, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION to Request Mediation, filed by Plaintiff Andre Hoskins. (SWT)
September 25, 2018 Filing 21 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Andre Hoskins, to 9 MOTION to Dismiss. (Attachments: # 1 Motion on ACLU Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff, # 3 Proposed Order #2 Granting Plaintiff) (PM)
September 20, 2018 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation (Kipling, Michael)
September 20, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael E Kipling on behalf of Defendant American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. (Kipling, Michael)
September 19, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Scott P Kennedy on behalf of Defendants City of Seattle, Seattle Office for Civil Rights, Seattle Public Library. (Kennedy, Scott)
September 11, 2018 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Andre Hoskins re 10 Response to Standing Order, 3 Standing Order, 12 MOTION to Amend 1 Complaint (SWT)
September 11, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE to Withdraw Pending Motion re 9 MOTION to Dismiss ; by Defendant American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. (Kipling, Michael)
September 10, 2018 Filing 15 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Seattle Office for Civil Rights on 9/10/2018 (SWT)
September 10, 2018 Filing 14 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant City of Seattle on 8/28/2018 (SWT)
September 10, 2018 Filing 13 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Seattle Public Library on 9/10/2018 (SWT)
September 10, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Amend 1 Complaint,, filed by Plaintiff Andre Hoskins. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Amended Complaint)(SWT)
September 10, 2018 Filing 11 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant American Civil Liberties Union Foundation on 8/28/2018 (SWT)
September 10, 2018 Filing 10 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Andre Hoskins re 3 Standing Order (SWT)
September 7, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendant American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/5/2018, (Kipling, Michael)
September 7, 2018 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation (Kipling, Michael)
September 7, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael E Kipling on behalf of Defendant American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. (Kipling, Michael)
September 7, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Scott P Kennedy on behalf of Defendant City of Seattle. (Kennedy, Scott)
September 5, 2018 Filing 5 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS for Seattle Public Library by Plaintiff Andre Hoskins (Issued at Intake counter) (PM)
September 5, 2018 Filing 4 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS for ACLU Corporate Office by Plaintiff Andre Hoskins (Issued at Intake counter) (PM)
August 29, 2018 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (cc: Plaintiff via first class mail) (VE)
August 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Andre Hoskins against defendant(s) American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, City of Seattle, Seattle Office for Civil Rights, Seattle Public Library, Teresa Selfe, Priya Wilson with JURY DEMAND (Summons(es) issued) (Receipt # SEA092105) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoskins v. American Civil Liberties Union Foundation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Selfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seattle Public Library
Represented By: Scott P Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
Represented By: Michael E Kipling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seattle Office for Civil Rights
Represented By: Scott P Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Priya Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Seattle
Represented By: Scott P Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Hoskins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?