Starrish v. Wofford

Petitioner: Doreen Starrish
Respondent: Deborah J Wofford
Case Number: 2:2018cv01257
Filed: August 23, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
0 Judge: John C Coughenour
1 Judge: James P Donohue
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 15, 2018 11 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Petitioner Doreen Starrish. (*NOTE TO FILER*: Motion is moot as filing fee was paid on 10/12/18) (Attachments: #1 Prison Trust Account)**4 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Doreen Starrish, Prisoner ID: 858219)(ST)
October 12, 2018 10 MOTION to Extend Due Date for Filing Habeas Corpus, filed by Petitioner Doreen Starrish. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Doreen Starrish, Prisoner ID: 858219)(ST)
October 12, 2018 9 2254 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, filed by Doreen Starrish. (Receipt # SEA092839) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)**33 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Doreen Starrish, Prisoner ID: 858219)(ST)
October 12, 2018 FILING FEE RECEIVED: Rec# SEA092839; $5.00 **1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Doreen Starrish, Prisoner ID: 858219)(ST)
October 12, 2018 ***Deadlines/Hearings terminated re #8 Letter re Deficiency. Filing fee paid. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Doreen Starrish, Prisoner ID: 858219)(ST)
September 28, 2018 8 LETTER mailed re IFP deficiency; - ****PAGE 2 - MUST HAVE SIGNATURE OF FINANCIAL OFFICER**** Filer has until 10/29/2018 to correct (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Doreen Starrish, Prisoner ID: 858219)(SG)
September 27, 2018 7 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Petitioner Doreen Starrish (Attachments: #1 Prison Trust Account Statement, #2 Exhibits, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Petition for Writ Of Habeas Corpus, #5 Proposed Motion to Extend Due Date for Filing Habeas Corpus)**38 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Doreen Starrish, Prisoner ID: 858219)(SG)
September 27, 2018 IFP deficiency corrected IN PART (Prison trust account statement with attachments filed - to be filed separately) **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Doreen Starrish, Prisoner ID: 858219)(SG)
September 25, 2018 6 LETTER mailed re IFP deficiency; - Please provide a certified copy of your prison trust account statement showing transactions for the last six months.- Signature is missing from the document(s). Please sign as appropriate.- ****Certification by Officer is required for both the IFP Application and the Prisoner Trust Account Statement. Attached is the IFP Application for Officer signature. Filer has until 10/25/2018 to correct (Attachments: #1 Incomplete IFP Application) **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Doreen Starrish, Prisoner ID: 858219)(SG)
September 24, 2018 5 EXHIBIT re #1 Proposed Document(s), by Petitioner Doreen Starrish (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2)**75 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Doreen Starrish, Prisoner ID: 858219)(SG)
September 24, 2018 4 IFP deficiency INCOMPLETE re #2 IFP Deficiency Letter, (Attachments: #1 Prison Trust Account Statement (not certified))**5 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (DOCUMENTS SUBMITTED ARE NOT COMPLETE - MISSING SIGNATURES-CERTIFICATION FOR IFP AND PRISON TRUST ACCOUNT STATEMENT MISSING. NEW IFP DEFICIENCY LETTER TO FOLLOW(Doreen Starrish, Prisoner ID: 858219)(SG)
August 28, 2018 3 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Proposed Document(s). Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Doreen Starrish, Prisoner ID: 858219)(ST)
August 28, 2018 2 LETTER mailed re IFP deficiency; - The proper IFP form was not submitted. Enclosed please find the correct IFP form to be filled out in full and returned to the Court.- Please provide a certified copy of your prison trust account statement showing transactions for the last six months. Filer has until 9/27/2018 to correct (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Doreen Starrish, Prisoner ID: 858219)(ST)
August 23, 2018 1 PROPOSED 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Petitioner Doreen Starrish. (NO FILING FEE/NO IFP) (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED Motion to Extend Due Date for Filing Habeas Corpus) **27 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Doreen Starrish, Prisoner ID: 858219)(ST) Modified on 8/31/2018 to add print instructions (KB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Starrish v. Wofford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Deborah J Wofford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Doreen Starrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?