Wood v. GLY Construction Inc

Plaintiff: Edmund J Wood
Defendant: GLY Construction Inc
Interested Party: Bankruptcy Withdrawal of Reference (SEA) and Bankruptcy Withdrawal of Ref (SEA)
Case Number: 2:2018cv01281
Filed: August 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and deferring in part defendant GLY Construction, Inc.'s #1 Motion to Withdraw Reference. This matter is STAYED pending further proceedings before Bankruptcy Court. Joint Status Report due within six months of the date of this Minute Order. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
September 6, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by GLY Construction Inc (Leaverton, Bruce)
September 6, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Bruce W Leaverton. Filed by Defendant GLY Construction Inc. (Leaverton, Bruce) Modified Law Firm Association/Address on 9/6/2018 (DS).
August 31, 2018 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 9/7/2018. (ST)
August 30, 2018 Filing 2 Letter from Clerk's Office to counsel advising of District Court case number, judge assignment re #1 MOTION to Withdraw the Reference. (ST) Modified on 8/31/2018. Letter regenerated to attorney(s) Michael M. Feinberg and Alan J Wenokur as filer did not add them upon case opening. (ST)
August 30, 2018 Judge Thomas S. Zilly added to case. (ST)
August 29, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION to Withdraw the Reference, filed by Defendant GLY Construction Inc. (Attachments: #1 Record on Appeal/Withdrawal of Reference) Noting Date 8/31/2018, No Fee Required(Bankruptcy Clerk (Sea))

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wood v. GLY Construction Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Bankruptcy Withdrawal of Reference (SEA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Bankruptcy Withdrawal of Ref (SEA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edmund J Wood
Represented By: Denice Elizabeth Moewes
Represented By: Alan Jay Wenokur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLY Construction Inc
Represented By: Bruce W Leaverton
Represented By: Michael M. Feinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?