Lomack v. State of Washington

Petitioner: John Ray Lomack
Respondent: State of Washington
Case Number: 2:2018cv01282
Filed: August 28, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
0 Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
1 Judge: Mary Alice Theiler
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 5, 2018 7 LETTER mailed re IFP deficiency; - Please provide a certified copy of your Prison Trust Account Statement showing transactions for the last six months. The document provided does not comply with the requirements of this court. - The financial officer at your facility must complete and sign page two of the IFP under "Certification." A copy of the IFP form is enclosed for your convenience. Filer has until 11/5/2018 to correct. (Sent to petitioner via USPS with a copy of previously filed IFP form) (ST)
October 3, 2018 6 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (page two) re #3 IFP Deficiency Letter, filed by Petitioner John Ray Lomack. (Attachments: #1 Resident Account History)(ST)
September 17, 2018 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #3 IFP Deficiency Letter, addressed to John Ray Lomack (SG)
September 13, 2018 4 LETTER from John Lomack re #3 IFP Deficiency Letter. (Copy of #3 Letter and page two of IFP resent to plaintiff via USPS) (ST)
August 30, 2018 3 LETTER mailed re IFP deficiency; - Please provide a certified copy of your prison trust account statement showing transactions for the last six months.- Attached is page 2 of the Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis: Signature of Financial Officer is missing. Please have page 2 signed and return to the Court. Filer has until 10/1/2018 to correct (SG)
August 29, 2018 2 LETTER mailed re IFP deficiency; - The filing fee requirement must be met. Please submit either the full $5.00 filing fee or an application for In Forma Pauperis (IFP) status.- Please provide a certified copy of your prison trust account statement showing transactions for the last six months. Filer has until 9/28/2018 to correct (SG) Modified on 8/30/2018 (NEW DEFICIENCY LETTER SENT WITH CORRECT LANGUAGE(SG).
August 28, 2018 1 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, by Petitioner John Ray Lomack (Attachments: #1 Proposed Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus)(SG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lomack v. State of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Ray Lomack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?