Tatari v. Safadi

Plaintiff: Aliya Tatari
Defendant: Amar Safadi
Case Number: 2:2018cv01286
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 11, 2018 18 JUDGMENT BY COURT: THE COURT HAS ORDERED THAT Pursuant to a finding under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) that the above-entitled matter is both frivolous and fails to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, this case is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. (SWT)
October 11, 2018 17 Featured Case ORDER dismissing this matter with prejudice, signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SWT)
October 11, 2018 16 NOTICE: Defendant Amar Safadi has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (PS)
October 10, 2018 15 Featured Case ORDER granting defendant's #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (PM) Modified on 10/10/2018: cc to defendant via first class mail (PM).
October 5, 2018 14 RETURN RECEIPT (Green Card) re service by certified mail executed upon Stanwood Police Department (SWT)
October 1, 2018 13 RETURN RECEIPT (Green Card) re service by certified mail executed upon Washington State Office of Administrative Hearings. (PM)
October 1, 2018 12 RETURN RECEIPT (Green Card) re service by certified mail executed upon Washington State Department of Social and Health Services (SWT)
October 1, 2018 11 RETURN RECEIPT (Green Card) re service by certified mail executed upon Washington State Sheriffs' Association (SWT)
October 1, 2018 10 RETURN RECEIPT (Green Card) re service by certified mail executed upon Snohomish County Superior Court (SWT)
September 24, 2018 9 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) to VACATE orders residing in Snohomish County Superior Court (no motion to vacate found among documents) (PM)
September 24, 2018 8 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned)to VACATE final Default Order in NFFR. (no motion found among documents filed) (PM)
September 24, 2018 7 REVISED MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Theiler, filed by Amar Safadi. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(PM)
September 5, 2018 6 MINUTE ORDER re: Defendant's #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Defendant is directed to submit a revised IFP application within twenty (20) days of this Order. Signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (PM) cc: Defendant with new IFP application
September 5, 2018 5 PROOF OF SERVICE by Defendant Amar Safadi re #2 Notice of Removal,, (TH)
August 30, 2018 4 NOTICE TO FILER: re #2 Notice of Removal,,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (Ad Hoc: David Coombs; Benjamin Haslam) (ST)
August 30, 2018 NOTICE TO FILER: re #2 Notice of Removal,, #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The original state court complaint contains personal identifiers that must be redacted pursuant to FRCP 5.2 and LCR 5.2. The defendant is required to re-file a redacted version of the state court complaint. Pursuant to FRCP 5.2 and LCR 5.2, the complaint has been administratively sealed by the Court. (cc: defendant via USPS w/copy of docket report with entry highlighted; Ad Hoc: David Coombs; Benjamin Haslam) (ST)
August 30, 2018 3 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from Snohomish County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (cc: defendant via USPS; Ad Hoc: David Coombs, Benjamin Haslam) (ST)
August 30, 2018 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL, filed by Amar Safadi from Snohomish County, case number 17-3-02837-31; (IFP Pending) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #2 State Court Document, SEALED #3 Complaint, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(ST) Modified on 8/31/18 as Notice of Removal was not filed as a separate docket entry and therefore the judge assignment letter couldn't be generated. Complaint sealed as it contains personal identifiers of minors. (Ad Hoc: David Coombs; Benjamin Haslam) (ST)
August 30, 2018 Hon. Marsha J. Pechman added to case. (ST)
August 30, 2018 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Mary Alice Theiler, filed by Amar Safadi. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Notice of Filing of Removal, #4 State Court Document)(CDA) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/31/2018: SEALED #5 Complaint) (ST). Modified on 8/31/2018 to add complaint to docket. Complaint sealed as it contains personal identifiers of minors. Complaint and accompanying documents refiled with #2 Notice of Removal. (ST) (Ad Hoc: David Coombs; Benjamin Haslam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tatari v. Safadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amar Safadi
Represented By: Amar Safadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aliya Tatari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?