Obuon v Eadie et al

Plaintiff: Toll Obuon
Defendant: Seattle Police Department, Judge J. Schindler, Judge Richard D. Eadie and Supreme Court of Washington State
Case Number: 2:2018cv01296
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 26, 2018 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jerry L. Taylor on behalf of Defendant Richard D. Eadie. (Taylor, Jerry)
October 23, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 12/4/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 11/20/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/27/2018. (LC) Modified on 10/23/2018: Copy of order sent to pro se plaintiff via first class mail (LC).
October 19, 2018 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Susan E Park on behalf of Defendant Seattle Police Department. (Park, Susan)
October 19, 2018 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ghazal Sharifi on behalf of Defendant Seattle Police Department. (Sharifi, Ghazal)
September 18, 2018 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND, filed by Toll Obuon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 58-60) (TH)
September 18, 2018 3 PRAECIPE to attach document (Redacted Exhibits) re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Toll Obuon (TH)
August 31, 2018 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Exhibits 1-35 contain personal identifiers that must be redacted pursuant to FRCP 5.2 and LCR 5.2. You are required to re-file a redacted version of the exhibits as soon as possible. The document(s) have been administratively sealed by the Court. (ST) (cc: plaintiff w/copy of docket report with Notice to Filer highlighted)
August 31, 2018 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Toll Obuon against defendant(s) Richard D. Eadie, J. Schindler, Seattle Police Department, Supreme Court of Washington State with JURY DEMAND. (Summons(es) not issued) (Receipt # SEA092194) (Attachments: # SEALED (1) Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Obuon v Eadie et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seattle Police Department
Represented By: Ghazal Sharifi
Represented By: Susan E Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge J. Schindler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Richard D. Eadie
Represented By: Jerry L. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Supreme Court of Washington State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toll Obuon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?