T.B. v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation et al

Plaintiff: T.B.
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation, Washington State Department of Transportation, Central Puget Sound Transit Authority and Central Puget Sound Regional Transit Authority
Case Number: 2:2018cv01298
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 25, 2018 23 Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice, filed by Defendants Central Puget Sound Regional Transit Authority, National Railroad Passenger Corporation, Washington State Department of Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/25/2018, (Wackerbarth, Tim)
October 24, 2018 22 Featured Case ORDER granting the #20 Stipulated Motion for withdrawal and substitution of counsel. The Law Offices of Simon H. Forgette, PS, and Attorneys Simon H Forgette and Janis M. Nevler added for Plaintiff T.B.; and Bishop Legal and Attorneys Derek K Moore; Raymond E.S. Bishop and Ben Ferguson terminated. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(CMG)
October 23, 2018 21 NOTICE of service by mail on former client re #20 Stipulated MOTION to Substitute Counsel ; filed by Plaintiff T.B.. (Moore, Derek)
October 23, 2018 20 Stipulated MOTION to Substitute Counsel, filed by Plaintiff T.B.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/23/2018, (Moore, Derek)
October 15, 2018 19 RESPONSE, by Defendants Central Puget Sound Regional Transit Authority, National Railroad Passenger Corporation, Washington State Department of Transportation, to #16 MOTION to Remand . (Yates, Andrew)
October 9, 2018 18 Featured Case ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time: FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is now set for 11/1/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is now set for 11/8/2018, and the Joint Status Report is now due by 11/15/2018, signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(CMG)
October 1, 2018 17 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time re Initial Scheduling Dates, filed by Defendants Central Puget Sound Regional Transit Authority, National Railroad Passenger Corporation, Washington State Department of Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/1/2018, (Wackerbarth, Tim)
September 24, 2018 16 MOTION to Remand , filed by Plaintiff T.B.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/19/2018, (Moore, Derek)
September 18, 2018 15 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER authorized by Judge James L. Robart. Case reassigned for all further proceedings to Judge Benjamin H. Settle as related to C18-0072BHS. All future pleadings shall bear the cause number C18-1298BHS. (PM) Cc to BHS
September 14, 2018 14 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #3 Declaration (non motion), #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendants Central Puget Sound Regional Transit Authority, National Railroad Passenger Corporation, Washington State Department of Transportation (Yates, Andrew)
September 11, 2018 13 PRAECIPE re #12 Answer to Complaint by Defendants Central Puget Sound Regional Transit Authority, National Railroad Passenger Corporation, Washington State Department of Transportation (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Answer and Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand)(Wackerbarth, Tim)
September 10, 2018 12 ANSWER to Complaint; with JURY DEMAND by Central Puget Sound Regional Transit Authority, National Railroad Passenger Corporation, Washington State Department of Transportation.(Yates, Andrew)
September 5, 2018 11 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by William M. McCool. Case reassigned to Judge James L. Robart for all further proceedings. Hon. Mary Alice Theiler no longer assigned to case. Cc to JLR. (KMP)
September 5, 2018 10 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:18-cv-00072, 2:18-cv-00093, 2:18-cv-00134, 3:18-cv-05062, 2:18-cv-00190, 3:18-cv-05106, 2:18-cv-00086, 3:18-cv-05366, 3:18-cv-05415, 3:18-cv-05448, 3:18-cv-05451, 3:18-cv-05452, 3:18-cv-05498, 3:18-cv-05564, 3:18-cv-05576, 2:18-cv-00648, 2:18-cv-01050, 3:18-cv-05572, 3:18-cv-05594, 3:18-cv-05617, 3:18-cv-05629, 3:18-cv-05684, by Defendants Central Puget Sound Regional Transit Authority, National Railroad Passenger Corporation, Washington State Department of Transportation. (Yates, Andrew)
September 5, 2018 9 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (ST)
September 4, 2018 8 PRAECIPE to attach document re #2 Notice-Other by Defendants Central Puget Sound Transit Authority, National Railroad Passenger Corporation, Washington State Department of Transportation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Notice to Plaintiff)(Wackerbarth, Tim)
September 4, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. Joint Status Report due by 10/16/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 10/2/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/9/2018. (KMP)
September 4, 2018 ***NOTICE TO PARTIES*** re #6 Consent Form. This district has adopted an opt-out consent procedure. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily CONSENTED to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge UNLESS the consent form is returned by the due date indicating lack of consent. (KMP)
September 4, 2018 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. If declining consent, return the executed form by 10/16/2018. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KMP)
September 4, 2018 5 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (ST)
September 4, 2018 Hon. Mary Alice Theiler added. (ST)
August 31, 2018 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate United States of America for National Railroad Passenger Corporation. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Yates, Andrew)
August 31, 2018 3 DECLARATION of Andrew G. Yates re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendants Central Puget Sound Transit Authority, National Railroad Passenger Corporation, Washington State Department of Transportation (Yates, Andrew)
August 31, 2018 2 NOTICE to Plaintiff re #1 Notice of Removal, ; filed by Defendants Central Puget Sound Transit Authority, National Railroad Passenger Corporation, Washington State Department of Transportation. (Yates, Andrew)
August 31, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 18-2-19283-8; (Receipt # 0981-5456537), filed by Washington State Department of Transportation, Central Puget Sound Transit Authority, National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint Exhibit A)(Yates, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: T.B. v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: Katie Bass
Represented By: Tim D. Wackerbarth
Represented By: Warren E. Babb, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew Gordon Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington State Department of Transportation
Represented By: Katie Bass
Represented By: Tim D. Wackerbarth
Represented By: Warren E. Babb, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew Gordon Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Puget Sound Transit Authority
Represented By: Katie Bass
Represented By: Tim D. Wackerbarth
Represented By: Warren E. Babb, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew Gordon Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Puget Sound Regional Transit Authority
Represented By: Katie Bass
Represented By: Tim D. Wackerbarth
Represented By: Warren E. Babb, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew Gordon Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T.B.
Represented By: Ben Ferguson
Represented By: Derek K Moore
Represented By: Raymond E.S. Bishop
Represented By: Janis M. Nevler
Represented By: Simon Henri Forgette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?