Maguire v. Eco Science Solutions, Inc et al

Plaintiff: Wendy Maguire and L. John Lewis
Defendant: Michael Rountree, Eco Science Solutions, Inc., Ga-Du Corporation and Eco Science Solutions, Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv01301
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 Attorney Linda Blohm Clapham for Ga-Du Corporation, L. John Lewis, Michael Rountree added; per #7 Notice of Appearance. (SWT)
October 16, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Linda Blohm Clapham on behalf of Defendant Eco Science Solutions, Inc. (Clapham, Linda)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 11/8/2018, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
October 11, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Lucinda Luke on behalf of Defendants Eco Science Solutions, Inc, Ga-Du Corporation, L. John Lewis, Michael Rountree. (Luke, Lucinda)
September 4, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Alan D Schuchman on behalf of Plaintiff Wendy Maguire. (Schuchman, Alan)
September 4, 2018 Filing 3 Summons(es) electronically issued as to defendant(s) Eco Science Solutions, Inc, Ga-Du Corporation, L. John Lewis, Michael Rountree. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(DJ)
September 4, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE TO FILER: Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (DJ)
September 4, 2018 Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (DJ)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Eco Science Solutions, Inc., Ga-Du Corporation, L. John Lewis, Michael Rountree with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5456869), filed by Wendy Maguire. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Eco Science Solutions, Inc., #3 Summons Ga-Du Corporation, #4 Summons to Michael Rountree, #5 Summons to L. John Lewis)(Nelson, Rochelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maguire v. Eco Science Solutions, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Maguire
Represented By: Alan D Schuchman
Represented By: Rochelle Y Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L. John Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Rountree
Represented By: Lucinda Luke
Represented By: Linda Blohm Clapham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eco Science Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ga-Du Corporation
Represented By: Lucinda Luke
Represented By: Linda Blohm Clapham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eco Science Solutions, Inc
Represented By: Lucinda Luke
Represented By: Linda Blohm Clapham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?