Safadi v. Roe et al

Plaintiff: Amar Safadi
Defendant: Mark Ferraz, James A. Pautler, Rory Hardy, Helena Maria Koltonowska, Mark Kirby Roe and Benjamin James Haslam
Case Number: 2:2018cv01305
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 18, 2018 17 RETURN RECEIPT (Green Card) re service by certified mail executed upon FBI Headquarters (TH)
October 15, 2018 16 Blank Form Summons Letter (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons) (TH)
October 11, 2018 15 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
October 11, 2018 14 NOTICE: Plaintiff Amar Safadi has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (PS)
October 10, 2018 13 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND, filed by Amar Safadi. (TH)
October 10, 2018 12 Featured Case ORDER granting Plaintiff's #10 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (TH) (cc: Plaintiff via first class mail)
September 25, 2018 11 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Paul M. Crisalli for Defendants Mark Ferraz, Rory Hardy, Benjamin James Haslam, Helena Maria Koltonowska, James A. Pautler, Mark Kirby Roe. (Crisalli, Paul)
September 24, 2018 10 MOTION (Revised) for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Amar Safadi. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(SWT)
September 18, 2018 9 RETURN RECEIPT (Green Card) re service by certified mail executed upon U.S. Department of Justice, Washington D.C. (PM)
September 14, 2018 8 RETURN RECEIPT (Green Card) re service by certified mail executed upon Washington State Patrol (SWT)
September 13, 2018 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Paul M. Crisalli on behalf of Defendants Mark Ferraz, Rory Hardy, Benjamin James Haslam, Helena Maria Koltonowska, James A. Pautler, Mark Kirby Roe. (Crisalli, Paul)
September 12, 2018 7 RETURN RECEIPT (Green Card) re service by certified mail executed upon US Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigation (SWT)
September 10, 2018 5 MINUTE ORDER re Plaintiff's deficient #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff must submit a revised IFP application within twenty (20) days of the date of this Order. Authorized by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (TH) (cc: Plaintiff via first class mail)
September 10, 2018 4 MOTION to Amend Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Amar Safadi. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Amended Complaint)(SWT)
September 5, 2018 3 PROOF of Service of Summons and Complaint on Robert W. Ferguson on 9/4/2018, filed by Plaintiff Amar Safadi. (PM)
September 4, 2018 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Theiler, filed by Amar Safadi. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Pro Se Electronic Filing Form)(DJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Safadi v. Roe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Ferraz
Represented By: Paul M. Crisalli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A. Pautler
Represented By: Paul M. Crisalli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rory Hardy
Represented By: Paul M. Crisalli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helena Maria Koltonowska
Represented By: Paul M. Crisalli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Kirby Roe
Represented By: Paul M. Crisalli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin James Haslam
Represented By: Paul M. Crisalli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amar Safadi
Represented By: Amar Safadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?