Balor Audio LLC v. Tracktion Software Corporation
Plaintiff: Balor Audio LLC
Defendant: TRAKTION SOFTWARE CORPORATION and Tracktion Software Corporation
Case Number: 2:2018cv01311
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2018 Filing 17 Stipulated MOTION and Order of Dismissal, filed by Counter Claimant Tracktion Software Corporation, Defendant Tracktion Software Corporation. Noting Date 10/19/2018, (Yanick, Miles)
October 16, 2018 Filing 16 ANSWER to #8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Balor Audio LLC.(Mann, Philip)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STANDING ORDER FOR PATENT CASES by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 11/16/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 11/2/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/9/2018, by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM)
September 26, 2018 Attorney James P Savitt added for Tracktion Software Corporation per #8 Answer to Complaint and Counterclaim. (PM)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #11 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Ricardo Bonilla for Defendant Tracktion Software Corporation and Counter Claimant Trackton Software Corporation by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) Modified on 9/26/2018 (DS).
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Neil J McNabnay for Defendant Tracktion Software Corporation and Counter Claimant Trackton Software Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) Modified on 9/26/2018 (DS).
September 25, 2018 Filing 11 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Ricardo Bonilla FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Counter Claimant Tracktion Software Corporation, Defendant Tracktion Software Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5485043 (Yanick, Miles)
September 25, 2018 Filing 10 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Neil J. McNabnay FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Counter Claimant Tracktion Software Corporation, Defendant Tracktion Software Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5485020 (Yanick, Miles)
September 25, 2018 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Tracktion Software Corporation (Yanick, Miles)
September 25, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND Attorney Miles Aaron Yanick added to party Tracktion Software Corporation(pty:dft), COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Balor Audio LLC by Tracktion Software Corporation.(Yanick, Miles)
September 6, 2018 Filing 7 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a Patent. Emailed to the U.S. Patent Office. (DJ)
September 6, 2018 Filing 6 Summons(es) electronically issued as to defendant(s) Tracktion Software Corporation. (DJ)
September 6, 2018 NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) Balor Audio LLC must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 9/13/2018. (DJ)
September 6, 2018 Judge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (DJ)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Eugenio Javier Torres-Oyola for Plaintiff Balor Audio LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #2 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jean G Vidal Font for Plaintiff Balor Audio LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
September 5, 2018 Filing 3 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Eugenio J. Torres Oyola FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Balor Audio LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5460009 (Mann, Philip)
September 5, 2018 Filing 2 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jean G. Vidal Font FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Balor Audio LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5459982 (Mann, Philip)
September 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) All Plaintiffs with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5459675) Attorney Philip P Mann added to party Balor Audio LLC(pty:pla), filed by Balor Audio LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120), #4 Summons)(Mann, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Balor Audio LLC v. Tracktion Software Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRAKTION SOFTWARE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracktion Software Corporation
Represented By: Ricardo Bonilla
Represented By: Miles Aaron Yanick
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Represented By: James P Savitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Balor Audio LLC
Represented By: Jean G Vidal-Font
Represented By: Eugenio Javier Torres-Oyola
Represented By: Philip P Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?