Doss v. Janssen Pharmaceutical, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Jermaine D Doss
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Corporation and Janssen Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv01314
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2018 21 MOTION to Amend Complaint and for U.S. Marshal Service, filed by Plaintiff Jermaine D Doss. Noted by Clerk for 10/5/2018. (PM)
September 14, 2018 20 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #17 Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only) addressed to Jermaine Doss. (Document resent to updated address) (TH)
September 11, 2018 19 MOTION to Appoint Counsel & NOTICE of Change of Address, filed by Plaintiff Jermaine D Doss. Noted by Clerk for 9/28/2018. (Clerk updated Plaintiff's address on docket) (PM)
September 6, 2018 17 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re: receipt of case from District of New Mexico (Albuquerque) and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (Letter sent to Pro Se Plaintiff Jermaine D. Doss via U.S. Postal Service). (DJ)
September 6, 2018 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (DJ)
September 6, 2018 16 Case transferred in from District of New Mexico, Case Number 1:17-cv-00866;.
August 30, 2018 15 Featured Case ORDER by District Judge Martha Vazquez that the Clerk of the Court TRANSFER this case to the United States District Court for the Western District of Washington under 28 U.S.C. Section 1404. (mjr) [Transferred from nmd on 9/6/2018.]
March 6, 2018 12 Partial Filing fee: $ 16.00, receipt number ALB039488 (vv)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [Transferred from nmd on 9/6/2018.]
March 5, 2018 14 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jermaine D Doss. (gr) [Transferred from nmd on 9/6/2018.]
March 5, 2018 13 ***FILED IN ERROR*** NOTICE of Change of Address by Jermaine D Doss. (gr) Modified text on 3/7/2018 add error language, wrong document attached (gr). [Transferred from nmd on 9/6/2018.]
February 8, 2018 11 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing by District Judge Martha Vazquez. (gr) [Transferred from nmd on 9/6/2018.]
January 16, 2018 10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jermaine D Doss. (gr) [Transferred from nmd on 9/6/2018.]
December 26, 2017 9 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jermaine D Doss. (gr) [Transferred from nmd on 9/6/2018.]
December 7, 2017 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #6 Mail Returned. Mail sent to Jermaine D. Doss. (gr) [Transferred from nmd on 9/6/2018.]
November 30, 2017 7 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing granting #4 Motion to Proceed under 28 U.S.C. 1915 and to Make Payments or Show Cause. (ccp) [Transferred from nmd on 9/6/2018.]
November 29, 2017 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re 5 Appendix/Supplement. Mail sent to Jermaine D. Doss. (gr) [Transferred from nmd on 9/6/2018.]
September 5, 2017 4 MOTION and Affidavit to Proceed under 28 U.S.C. 1915 by Jermaine D Doss. (gr) [Transferred from nmd on 9/6/2018.]
August 28, 2017 3 Featured Case ORDER to Cure Deficiency by Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing. Plaintiff must either pay the $400.00 filing fee or submit an Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs by 9/27/2017. (ccp) [Transferred from nmd on 9/6/2018.]
August 24, 2017 District Judge Martha Vazquez assigned. (kdh) [Transferred from nmd on 9/6/2018.]
August 23, 2017 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that United States Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing has been assigned for a 28 U.S.C. 1915 (a)(1) and (e)(2) review. (kdh)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [Transferred from nmd on 9/6/2018.]
August 23, 2017 Magistrate Judge Laura Fashing assigned. (kdh) [Transferred from nmd on 9/6/2018.]
August 22, 2017 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jermaine D Doss. (gr) [Transferred from nmd on 9/6/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doss v. Janssen Pharmaceutical, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jermaine D Doss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?