Jama v. North Star Fishing Company et al

Plaintiff: Hussein Jama
Defendant: F/T CAPE HORN, Cape Horn Vessel LLC, North Star Fishing LLC and North Star Fishing Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv01323
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:688
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 26, 2018 12 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Nathan John Beard on behalf of Defendants Cape Horn Vessel LLC, North Star Fishing Company. (Beard, Nathan)
October 25, 2018 11 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
October 25, 2018 10 MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case, or that attorney's representative, should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation; If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, local counsel should attend on behalf of non-local counsel. If local counsel is unavailable, non-local counsel may make arrangements to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at Paul_Pierson@wawd.uscourts.gov at least TEN (10) DAYS in advance of the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. STATUS CONFERENCE has been ordered set for 11/13/2018 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
September 20, 2018 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint In Rem and In Personam for Personal Injury by Cape Horn Vessel LLC, North Star Fishing Company.(Shields, Louis)
September 18, 2018 8 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by William M. McCool. Case reassigned to U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour for all further proceedings. Hon. Brian A Tsuchida no longer assigned to case. Cc to JCC. (AE)
September 12, 2018 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each partywill be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before the assignedMagistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 9/19/2018. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (AE)
September 12, 2018 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Cape Horn Vessel LLC, North Star Fishing Company (Shields, Louis)
September 12, 2018 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Travis Connor Sheffield on behalf of Plaintiff Hussein Jama. (Sheffield, Travis)
September 12, 2018 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Louis A Shields on behalf of Defendants Cape Horn Vessel LLC, North Star Fishing Company. (Shields, Louis)
September 10, 2018 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Summons Cape Horn Vessel LLC, #2 Summons F/T Cape Horn) (Main document - Summons North Star Fishing Company) (CDA)
September 10, 2018 2 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (CDA)
September 10, 2018 Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (CDA)
September 7, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Hussein Jama (Receipt # 0981-5463482), filed by Hussein Jama. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Sheffield, Dann)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jama v. North Star Fishing Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F/T CAPE HORN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cape Horn Vessel LLC
Represented By: Louis A Shields
Represented By: Nathan John Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Star Fishing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Star Fishing Company
Represented By: Louis A Shields
Represented By: Nathan John Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hussein Jama
Represented By: Dann D Sheffield
Represented By: Travis Connor Sheffield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?