Wood v. Premium Assignment Corporation

Plaintiff: Edmund J Wood
Defendant: Premium Assignment Corporation
Interested Party: Bankruptcy Withdrawal of Reference (SEA) and Bankruptcy Withdrawal of Ref (SEA)
Case Number: 2:2018cv01336
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - Corporate Parent or Affiliate indicated by filer, but not added in CM/ECF. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Premium Assignment Corporation (Leaverton, Bruce)
September 11, 2018 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 9/18/2018. (ST)
September 11, 2018 Judge Richard A. Jones added to case. (ST)
September 10, 2018 Filing 2 Letter from Clerk's Office to counsel advising of District Court case number, judge assignment re #1 MOTION to Withdraw the Reference. (ST)
September 10, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION to Withdraw the Reference, filed by Defendant Premium Assignment Corporation. No Fee Required.(Attachments: #1 Record on Appeal/Withdrawal of Reference) Noting Date 9/14/2018, (Bankruptcy Clerk (Sea))

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wood v. Premium Assignment Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Bankruptcy Withdrawal of Reference (SEA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Bankruptcy Withdrawal of Ref (SEA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edmund J Wood
Represented By: Denice Elizabeth Moewes
Represented By: Alan Jay Wenokur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premium Assignment Corporation
Represented By: Bruce W Leaverton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?