Colbert v. Haynes

Petitioner: Bobby Darrell Colbert
Respondent: Ron Haynes
Case Number: 2:2018cv01350
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
0 Judge: James P Donohue
1 Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2018 16 RESPONSE, by Respondent Ron Haynes, to #13 MOTION. **PRINT ALL**(Bobby Colbert, Prisoner ID: 879561)(Samson, John)
October 26, 2018 15 Featured Case ORDER directing response to Petitioner's #13 MOTION for Release from Confinement. Respondent's #13 Motion is noted for 11/23/2018. Reply, if any, due by 11/23/2018. Signed by Hon. James P. Donohue. ** 4 2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Bobby Colbert, Prisoner ID: 879561)(PM) Modified on 10/30/2018 (PS).
October 15, 2018 14 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney John Joseph Samson on behalf of Respondent Ron Haynes. **PRINT ALL**(Bobby Colbert, Prisoner ID: 879561)(Samson, John)
October 4, 2018 13 MOTION for Release from Confinement, filed by Petitioner Bobby Darrell Colbert. **DO NOT PRINT**(Bobby Colbert, Prisoner ID: 879561)(ST)
October 4, 2018 12 Featured Case ORDER FOR SERVICE AND ANSWER, #1 2254 PETITION OF WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS by Hon. James P. Donohue. Documents served electronically to Attorney General of the State of Washington on 10/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Pro Se Instruction Sheet)**5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Bobby Colbert, Prisoner ID: 879561)(ST)
October 4, 2018 11 Featured Case ORDER DENYING PETITIONER'S #5 MOTION FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING AND #4 MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL by Hon. James P. Donohue. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Bobby Colbert, Prisoner ID: 879561)(ST)
October 4, 2018 10 2254 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Bobby Darrell Colbert. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Petition)**DO NOT PRINT**(Bobby Colbert, Prisoner ID: 879561)(ST)
October 4, 2018 9 Featured Case ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Hon. James P. Donohue.**1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Bobby Colbert, Prisoner ID: 879561)(ST)
October 4, 2018 8 PROPOSED MOTION FOR RELEASE FROM CONFINEMENT filed by Petitioner Bobby Darrell Colbert **3 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Bobby Colbert, Prisoner ID: 879561)(SG)
September 21, 2018 7 LETTER from Bobby Colbert re #4 Proposed Document(s) filed by Bobby Darrell Colbert (document split into correct docket entries)**1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Bobby Colbert, Prisoner ID: 879561)(SG)
September 17, 2018 6 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT filed by Petitioner Bobby Darrell Colbert re #1 Petition for Habeas Corpus **9 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Bobby Colbert, Prisoner ID: 879561)(SG)
September 17, 2018 5 PROPOSED Requesting Evidentiary Hearing filed by Petitioner Bobby Darrell Colbert **4 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Bobby Colbert, Prisoner ID: 879561)(SG)
September 17, 2018 4 PROPOSED Motion for Counsel filed by Petitioner Bobby Darrell Colbert **15 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Bobby Colbert, Prisoner ID: 879561)(SG) (Main Document 4 replaced on 9/21/2018) (SG).
September 14, 2018 2 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Bobby Colbert, Prisoner ID: 879561)(SG)
September 12, 2018 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Bobby Darrell Colbert. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Petition for Writ Of Habeas Corpus, #2 Prison Trust Account Statement)**19 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Bobby Colbert, Prisoner ID: 879561)(SG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colbert v. Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bobby Darrell Colbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ron Haynes
Represented By: John Joseph Samson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?