Party Storm Co. v. Sun Balloon et al

Plaintiff: Party Storm Co.
Defendant: RosyMe and Sun Balloon
Case Number: 2:2018cv01361
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 2, 2018 Reset Deadlines: At plaintiff's request, the initial scheduling deadlines are continued as follows:FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/14/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/22/2019, Joint Status Report due by 1/28/2019 (LW)
October 16, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 11/27/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 11/13/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/20/2018, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (LW)
September 14, 2018 6 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Mailed to the US Copyright Office (CDA)
September 14, 2018 5 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) RosyMe, Sun Balloon (Attachments: #1 Summons)(CDA)
September 14, 2018 Judge Marsha J. Pechman added. (CDA)
September 13, 2018 4 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, to Defendant RosyMe by Plaintiff Party Storm Co. (Culbert, Regina)
September 13, 2018 3 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, to Defendant Sun Balloon by Plaintiff Party Storm Co. (Culbert, Regina)
September 13, 2018 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Party Storm Co. (Culbert, Regina)
September 13, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5471288) Attorney Regina Vogel Culbert added to party Party Storm Co.(pty:pla), filed by Party Storm Co.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Report on Copyrights (AO Form 121))(Culbert, Regina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Party Storm Co. v. Sun Balloon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Party Storm Co.
Represented By: Regina Vogel Culbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RosyMe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Balloon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?