Tappe v. DIT, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jayne Tappe
Defendant: X Y Z Insurance Co and DIT, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv01363
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' #29 Stipulation and Order to Withdraw as Counsel Upon Substitution. Michael Barcott is hereby granted leave to withdraw as counsel for Defendant DIT, LLC, and Daniel F. Mullin and Aaron P. Gilligan of Mullin, Allen & Steiner PLLC are hereby substituted as counsel of record for Defendant DIT, LLC. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
November 1, 2018 Filing 29 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Withdraw as Counsel Upon Substitution by parties (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mullin, Daniel)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER re #27 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney David Schexnaydre for Plaintiff Jayne Tappe by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
September 25, 2018 Filing 27 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY David Schexnaydre FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Jayne Tappe (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5484384 (Pipinich, Joseph)
September 25, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Joseph B Pipinich on behalf of Plaintiff Jayne Tappe. (Pipinich, Joseph)
September 24, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael A Barcott on behalf of Defendant DIT, LLC. (Barcott, Michael)
September 14, 2018 Filing 24 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re: receipt of case from District of Louisiana (Western) and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (DJ)
September 14, 2018 Filing 23 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Western, Case Number 5:17-cv-01384;.
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Adopting #21 Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge, Granting #12 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or in the Alternative Transfer Venue. This civil action is transferred to the Western District of Washington, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 9/14/2018. (crt,Crawford, A) [Transferred from lawd on 9/14/2018.]
September 14, 2018 U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour added. (DJ)
August 30, 2018 Filing 21 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Transfer Case filed by D I T L L C. IT IS RECOMMENDED that DIT's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or in the Alternative Transfer Venue (Doc. 12) be granted by transferring venue of this civil action, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), to the Western District of Washington. Objections to R&R due by 9/13/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/30/2018. (crt,Keller, J) [Transferred from lawd on 9/14/2018.]
May 8, 2018 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Transfer Case filed by D I T L L C. (aty,Vondenstein, Michael) [Transferred from lawd on 9/14/2018.]
May 3, 2018 Filing 19 TABLE OF CONTENTS AND CASES re #18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Jayne Tappe. (aty,Schexnaydre, David) Modified on 5/3/2018 to add document relation and edit name if filing (FinnSld, P). [Transferred from lawd on 9/14/2018.]
May 2, 2018 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Transfer Case, SEE Document #19 for Table of Contents and Cases, filed by Jayne Tappe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(aty,Schexnaydre, David) Modified on 5/3/2018 to add document relation (FinnSld, P). [Transferred from lawd on 9/14/2018.]
April 23, 2018 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Transfer Case by D I T L L C. (crt,FinnSld, P) [Transferred from lawd on 9/14/2018.]
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to File Executed Affidavit in Support of #12 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 4/23/2018. (crt,FinnSld, P) [Transferred from lawd on 9/14/2018.]
April 20, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File Executed Affidavit in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer to Court of Proper Venue with consent by D I T L L C. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Executed Affidavit of John Paul Johnston with Exhibit, #2 Certificate in Compliance With Local Rule 7.4.1, #3 Proposed Order)(aty,Vondenstein, Michael) Modified on 4/23/2018 to edit text (FinnSld, P).[Transferred from lawd on 9/14/2018.]
April 18, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, MOTION to Transfer to Court of Proper Venue. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,FinnSld, P) [Transferred from lawd on 9/14/2018.]
April 17, 2018 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating other affiliate as Jamestown Marine Services Inc by D I T L L C. (aty,Vondenstein, Michael) Modified on 4/18/2018 to add other affiliate (FinnSld, P). [Transferred from lawd on 9/14/2018.]
April 17, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, MOTION to Transfer to Court of Proper Venue, SEE #12 Affidavit, by D I T L L C. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit #1)(aty,Vondenstein, Michael). Added MOTION to Transfer Case and edit text on 4/18/2018 (FinnSld, P). Modified on 4/24/2018 to add document relation (FinnSld, P). [Transferred from lawd on 9/14/2018.]
April 11, 2018 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: The deadline for DIT, LLC to file a corporate disclosure statement is extended to 4/17/18 to coincide with its deadline to file a response to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L. Hornsby on 4/11/2018. (crt,Guin, P.) [Transferred from lawd on 9/14/2018.]
April 11, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 4/17/2018 per Minute Entry. (crt,Keller, J) [Transferred from lawd on 9/14/2018.]
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, D I T L L C answer due 4/17/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 3/28/2018. (crt,Keller, J) [Transferred from lawd on 9/14/2018.]
March 28, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #8 Motion for Extension (Other), sent to Michael J Vondenstein on behalf of D I T L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 4/11/2018. (crt,FinnSld, P) [Transferred from lawd on 9/14/2018.]
March 27, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION FOR EXTENSION of Time to Respond to Complaint with consent by D I T L L C. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Certificate in Compliance With Local Rule 7.9, #2 Proposed order)(Attorney Michael J Vondenstein added to party D I T L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Vondenstein, Michael) Modified on 3/28/2018 to edit text (FinnSld, P). [Transferred from lawd on 9/14/2018.]
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF DISMISSAL as to X Y Z Insurance Co by Clerk under LR41.3. Case may be reinstated within 30 days for good cause shown.By Tony R Moore, Clerk of Court on 3/16/2018. (crt,Crick, S) [Transferred from lawd on 9/14/2018.]
March 16, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Intent to dismiss D I T L L C for Failure to take default 60 days after service. (crt,Mitchell, Pam) [Transferred from lawd on 9/14/2018.]
March 13, 2018 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk. Case reassigned to Judge Terry A. Doughty. Judge Robert G. James no longer assigned to case. All motions previously pending before Judge James are transferred to Judge Doughty. All deadlines and hearings remain as set pending further review by the court. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment. Approved by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 3/13/2018.(crt,Whidden, C) [Transferred from lawd on 9/14/2018.]
February 28, 2018 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on DIT, LLC on 10/27/2017, filed by Jayne Tappe. (aty,Schexnaydre, David) Modified on 2/28/2018 to correct date of service(FinnSld, P). [Transferred from lawd on 9/14/2018.]
February 26, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Intent to dismiss CASE for Failure to effect service within 90 days. (crt,Crawford, A) [Transferred from lawd on 9/14/2018.]
October 26, 2017 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to D I T L L C (crt,Keller, J) [Transferred from lawd on 9/14/2018.]
October 26, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against D I T L L C, X Y Z Insurance Co with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3496759) filed by Jayne Tappe. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Proposed summons/writ)(Attorney David J Schexnaydre added to party Jayne Tappe(pty:pla))(aty,Schexnaydre, David) (Attachment 2 replaced on 10/26/2017) (Keller, J). Modified on 10/26/2017 to edit text, filers and reflect Attachment 2 replaced with a non-fillable pdf. (Keller, J). [Transferred from lawd on 9/14/2018.]
October 26, 2017 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert G James and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Keller, J) [Transferred from lawd on 9/14/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tappe v. DIT, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jayne Tappe
Represented By: David J Schexnaydre
Represented By: Joseph B Pipinich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: X Y Z Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIT, LLC
Represented By: Michael J Vondenstein
Represented By: Daniel Francis Mullin
Represented By: Michael A Barcott
Represented By: Aaron P Gilligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?