Firoved v. Haynes

Petitioner: Ryan David Firoved
Respondent: Ron Haynes
Case Number: 2:2018cv01382
Filed: September 18, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
0 Judge: Mary Alice Theiler
1 Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 18, 2018 5 MOTION TO COMPEL WRITTEN RESPONSE FROM INSTITUTION re #2 Letter re IFP Deficiency, filed by Petitioner Ryan David Firoved. **4 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Ryan Firoved, Prisoner ID: 813476)(ST)
October 18, 2018 4 PETITIONER'S RESPONSE TO IFP DEFICIENCY, filed by Petitioner Ryan David Firoved re #2 IFP Deficiency Letter. (Attachments: #1 Letter to DOC re IFP Deficiency)**10 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Ryan Firoved, Prisoner ID: 813476)(ST)
October 4, 2018 3 NOTICE OF FILING OF CASE DOCUMENTS ; filed by Petitioner Ryan David Firoved re #1 Proposed 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. **8 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Ryan Firoved, Prisoner ID: 813476)(SG) Modified on 10/19/2018 to add link to 2254 Petition. (ST)
September 19, 2018 2 LETTER mailed re IFP deficiency; - The institution where you are housed must complete page two of the IFP form under "Certification." Thank you. Filer has until 10/19/2018 to correct (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Ryan Firoved, Prisoner ID: 813476)(ST)
September 18, 2018 NOTICE TO FILER: Page 31 of the #1 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus was not submitted. Please file page 31 as soon as possible. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Ryan Firoved, Prisoner ID: 813476)(ST)
September 18, 2018 1 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Petitioner Ryan David Firoved . (Filer submitted duplicate copies of portions of the petition posted as Attachment 4) (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Exhibit, #3 Prison Trust Account, #4 DUPLICATE Documents)**87 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Ryan Firoved, Prisoner ID: 813476)(ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Firoved v. Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ryan David Firoved
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ron Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?