Shelp et al v. Allergan, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Pamela C. Shelp and Scott R. Shelp
Defendant: Allergan Sales, Inc., Maher M. Anous, M.D., Allergan, Inc., La Provence Esthetic Surgery & Medical Spa, Allergan plc, Mentor Worldwide, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Allergen PLC and Maher M. Anous
Case Number: 2:2018cv01427
Filed: September 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6), filed by Defendant Mentor Worldwide, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/30/2018, (Leedom, William)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting Defendants' #12 Motion to Dismiss. All Plaintiffs' claims against Defendants Allergan, Inc., Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan Sales, LLC, and Allergan PLC are DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiffs via USPS) Modified docket text on 11/5/2018 (SWT).
October 26, 2018 Filing 18 REPLY, filed by Defendants Allergan Sales, Inc., Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan, Inc., Allergen PLC, TO RESPONSE to #12 MOTION to Dismiss (Baumgardner, Kevin)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re #16 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Dustin B Rawlin for Defendant Mentor Worldwide, LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
October 4, 2018 Filing 16 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Dustin B. Rawlin FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Mentor Worldwide, LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5497396 (Leedom, William)
October 4, 2018 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Ethicon, Inc., Other Affiliate Johnson & Johnson for Mentor Worldwide, LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Mentor Worldwide, LLC (Norman, David)
October 4, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney David M Norman on behalf of Defendant Mentor Worldwide, LLC. (Norman, David)
October 4, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney William James Leedom on behalf of Defendant Mentor Worldwide, LLC. (Leedom, William)
October 4, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendants Allergan Sales, Inc., Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan, Inc., Allergen PLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/26/2018, (Baumgardner, Kevin)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (cc: hard copies to plaintiffs via U.S. Mail on 10/1/18)(PP)
October 1, 2018 Filing 10 MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case, or that attorney's representative, should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation; If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, local counsel should attend on behalf of non-local counsel. If local counsel is unavailable, non-local counsel may make arrangements to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at Paul_Pierson@wawd.uscourts.gov at least TEN (10) DAYS in advance of the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. A Status Conference is ordered set for 1/8/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (cc: hard copy to plaintiffs via U.S. Mail on 10/1/18)(PP)
September 28, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (Copy of notice and docket report sent to plaintiff(s) via USPS) (ST)
September 28, 2018 Filing 8 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (cc: plaintiff(s) via USPS) (ST)
September 28, 2018 U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour added. (ST)
September 27, 2018 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Allergan Sales, Inc., Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan plc, Allergan, Inc. (Baumgardner, Kevin)
September 27, 2018 Filing 6 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendants Allergan Sales, Inc., Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan plc, Allergan, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baumgardner, Kevin)
September 27, 2018 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Judith W. Tomkins re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendants Allergan Sales, Inc., Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan plc, Allergan, Inc. (Baumgardner, Kevin)
September 27, 2018 Filing 4 DECLARATION of James Suozzo re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendants Allergan Sales, Inc., Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan plc, Allergan, Inc. (Baumgardner, Kevin)
September 27, 2018 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Sheila LaRussa re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendants Allergan Sales, Inc., Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan plc, Allergan, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Baumgardner, Kevin)
September 27, 2018 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Jeff Bone in Support of Notice of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendants Allergan Sales, Inc., Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan plc, Allergan, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Baumgardner, Kevin)
September 27, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 18-2-14049-8 SEA; (Receipt # 0981-5488848), filed by Allergan Sales, Inc., Allergan plc, Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Baumgardner, Kevin) Modified on 9/28/2018 to change description of attachment 1. (ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shelp et al v. Allergan, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin C Baumgardner
Represented By: Jeff Bone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maher M. Anous, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin C Baumgardner
Represented By: Jeff Bone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Provence Esthetic Surgery & Medical Spa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan plc
Represented By: Kevin C Baumgardner
Represented By: Jeff Bone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mentor Worldwide, LLC
Represented By: Dustin B Rawlin
Represented By: William James Leedom
Represented By: David M Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin C Baumgardner
Represented By: Jeff Bone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergen PLC
Represented By: Kevin C Baumgardner
Represented By: Jeff Bone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maher M. Anous
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela C. Shelp
Represented By: Casey M Arbenz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott R. Shelp
Represented By: Casey M Arbenz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?