Sadler v. Bullard et al

Petitioner: Stanley Scott Sadler
Respondent: Mary J Bullard and Stephen Sinclair
Case Number: 2:2018cv01440
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Referring Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ana L Yu on behalf of Respondents Mary J Bullard, Stephen Sinclair. (Yu, Ana)
October 15, 2018 Filing 7 RETURN RECEIPT (Green Card) re service by certified mail executed upon Stephen Sinclair (TH)
October 15, 2018 Filing 6 RETURN RECEIPT (Green Card) re service by certified mail executed upon Mary J. Bullard (TH)
October 12, 2018 Filing 5 RETURN RECEIPT (Green Card) re service by certified mail executed upon Attorney General, State of Washington (SWT)
October 5, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Michael Filipovic for Petitioner Stanley Scott Sadler. (Filipovic, Michael)
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Vicki W. W. Lai on behalf of Petitioner Stanley Scott Sadler. (Lai, Vicki)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER FOR SERVICE 2254 PETITION, ANSWER, AND APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. Served by Certified Mail on 10/4/18 to Mary J. Bullard; Stephen Sinclair; Attorney General of the State of Washington. (cc: petitioner via USPS) (ST)
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 2254 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Receipt # SEA92649), filed by Stanley Scott Sadler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(SG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sadler v. Bullard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Stanley Scott Sadler
Represented By: Vicki W. W. Lai
Represented By: Michael Filipovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mary J Bullard
Represented By: Ana L Yu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Stephen Sinclair
Represented By: Ana L Yu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?