United States of America v. CH2M Hill, Inc

Petitioner: United States of America
Respondent: CH2M Hill, Inc. and CH2M Hill, Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv01452
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 29, 2018 16 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER OF WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by parties (Sobotka, Ryan)
October 19, 2018 15 REPLY, filed by Petitioner United States of America, TO RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Enforement of Civil Investigative Demand Pursuant to 31 U.S.C. and to Compel Production of Documents (Dave, Pooja)
October 18, 2018 14 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Pooja Faldu Dave on behalf of Petitioner United States of America. (Dave, Pooja)
October 17, 2018 13 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney David Roy East for Petitioner United States of America. (East, David)
October 15, 2018 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Jacobs Engineering Group Inc, Corporate Parent CH2M HILL Companies, Ltd. for CH2M Hill, Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by CH2M Hill, Inc (Paulin, Lindsay)
October 15, 2018 11 DECLARATION of Lindsay M. Paulin re #10 Response to Motion by Respondent CH2M Hill, Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Paulin, Lindsay)
October 15, 2018 10 RESPONSE, by Respondent CH2M Hill, Inc, to #1 Petition for Enforement of Civil Investigative Demand Pursuant to 31 U.S.C. and to Compel Production of Documents. (Paulin, Lindsay)
October 10, 2018 9 Featured Case ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Joseph D West for CH2M Hill, Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
October 10, 2018 8 Featured Case ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Lindsey M Paulin for CH2M Hill, Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
October 10, 2018 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Joseph D. West FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Respondent CH2M Hill, Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5502929 (Sobotka, Ryan)
October 10, 2018 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Lindsay M. Paulin FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Respondent CH2M Hill, Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5502899 (Sobotka, Ryan)
October 10, 2018 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ryan Chandler Sobotka on behalf of Respondent CH2M Hill, Inc. (Sobotka, Ryan)
October 5, 2018 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant CH2M Hill, Inc mailed on 10/4/2018 (East, David)
October 4, 2018 Noting Date Set re #1 Petition for Enforement of Civil Investigative Demand Pursuant to 31 U.S.C. and to Compel Production of Documents: Noting Date 10/19/2018. Docket entry #1 modified to turn Petition into a motion for ECF purposes only. (PM)
October 4, 2018 3 Summons(es) electronically issued as to defendant(s) CH2M Hill, Inc. (DJ)
October 4, 2018 Judge Marsha J. Pechman added. (DJ)
October 3, 2018 2 DECLARATION of David R. East in Support of United States' Petition and Memorandum for Enforcement of Civil Investigative Demand Pursuant to 31 U.S.C. 3733 and to Compel Production of Documents re #1 Petition (Other), by Petitioner United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R)(East, David)
October 3, 2018 1 PETITION and Memorandum for Enforcement of Civil Investigative Demand Pursuant to 31 U.S.C. 3733 and to Compel Production of Documents, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Proposed Order)(East, David) (Fee Waived) Modified on 10/4/2018 to turn into a motion. Noted for 10/19/2018 (PM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. CH2M Hill, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: David Roy East
Represented By: Kayla Stahman
Represented By: Pooja Faldu Dave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CH2M Hill, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CH2M Hill, Inc
Represented By: Joseph D West
Represented By: Lindsay M Paulin
Represented By: Ryan Chandler Sobotka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?