0912139 B.C. Ltd et al v. Rampion USA Inc et al
Plaintiff: 0912139 B.C. LTD., PAKAGE APPAREL INC., Pakage Apparel Inc and 0912139 B.C. Ltd
Defendant: RAMPION USA INC., RAMPION ENTERPRISES LTD., Rampion Enterprises Ltd and Rampion USA Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv01464
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Rampion Enterprises Ltd (Meiklejohn, Paul)
November 14, 2018 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Rampion USA Inc (Meiklejohn, Paul)
November 14, 2018 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Rampion USA Inc.(Meiklejohn, Paul)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge James L. Robart. Joint Status Report due by 12/12/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 11/21/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/5/2018. (AD)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Case Deadlines re parties' #15 Stipulation. Rampion USA's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is 11/14/2018 and Rampion Enterprises' deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint is December 21, 2018. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
November 1, 2018 Case Reassigned to Judge James L. Robart. Judge Robert S. Lasnik no longer assigned to the case. (KERR)
October 30, 2018 Filing 15 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND CASE DEADLINES by parties (Meiklejohn, Paul)
October 30, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Erin C Kolter on behalf of Defendants Rampion Enterprises Ltd, Rampion USA Inc. (Kolter, Erin)
October 30, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Paul T Meiklejohn on behalf of Defendants Rampion Enterprises Ltd, Rampion USA Inc. (Meiklejohn, Paul)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #11 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Nathan C Brunette for Plaintiffs 0912139 B.C. Ltd, and for Pakage Apparel Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
October 25, 2018 Filing 11 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Nathan C. Brunette FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs 0912139 B.C. Ltd, Pakage Apparel Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5521307 (Park, Brian)
October 24, 2018 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Rampion USA Inc. on 10/10/2018, filed by Plaintiffs 0912139 B.C. Ltd, Pakage Apparel Inc. (Park, Brian)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Steven T Lovett for Plaintiffs 0912139 B.C. Ltd, and for Pakage Apparel Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
October 17, 2018 Filing 8 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Steven T. Lovett FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs 0912139 B.C. Ltd, Pakage Apparel Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5510997 (Park, Brian)
October 9, 2018 Filing 7 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a Patent. Emailed to the U.S. Patent Office. (DJ)
October 9, 2018 Filing 6 Summons(es) electronically issued as to defendant(s) Rampion Enterprises Ltd, Rampion USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(DJ)
October 9, 2018 Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (DJ)
October 5, 2018 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by 0912139 B.C. LTD., PAKAGE APPAREL INC. (Park, Brian)
October 5, 2018 Filing 4 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Rampion USA Inc. by Plaintiffs 0912139 B.C. LTD., PAKAGE APPAREL INC. (Park, Brian)
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Rampion Enterprises Ltd. by Plaintiffs 0912139 B.C. LTD., PAKAGE APPAREL INC. (Park, Brian)
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint, ; filed by Plaintiffs 0912139 B.C. LTD., PAKAGE APPAREL INC.. (Park, Brian)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against defendant(s) 0912139 B.C. LTD., PAKAGE APPAREL INC. with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5498097) Attorney Brian C Park added to party 0912139 B.C. LTD.(pty:pla), Attorney Brian C Park added to party PAKAGE APPAREL INC.(pty:pla), filed by 0912139 B.C. LTD., PAKAGE APPAREL INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Park, Brian) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/9/2018: #6 Report on Patent or Trademark) (ST). Modified on 10/9/2018. Received report from filer via email. (ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 0912139 B.C. Ltd et al v. Rampion USA Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 0912139 B.C. LTD.
Represented By: Brian C Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAKAGE APPAREL INC.
Represented By: Brian C Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pakage Apparel Inc
Represented By: Brian C Park
Represented By: Steven T Lovett
Represented By: Nathan C Brunette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 0912139 B.C. Ltd
Represented By: Brian C Park
Represented By: Steven T Lovett
Represented By: Nathan C Brunette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAMPION USA INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAMPION ENTERPRISES LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rampion Enterprises Ltd
Represented By: Erin C Kolter
Represented By: Paul T Meiklejohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rampion USA Inc
Represented By: Erin C Kolter
Represented By: Paul T Meiklejohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?