Barker v. Thrive Causemetics, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Sara M. Barker
Defendant: Thrive Causemetics, Inc. and Karissa Bodnar
Case Number: 2:2018cv01470
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2018 16 REPLY, filed by Defendant Karissa Bodnar, TO RESPONSE to #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Devlin, John)
November 5, 2018 15 DECLARATION of Elizabeth A. Hanley filed by Plaintiff Sara M. Barker re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Hanley, Elizabeth)
November 5, 2018 14 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Sara M. Barker, to #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hanley, Elizabeth)
October 19, 2018 13 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendants Karissa Bodnar, Thrive Causemetics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-I)(Devlin, John)
October 18, 2018 12 DECLARATION of Taylor Washburn filed by Defendant Karissa Bodnar re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Devlin, John)
October 18, 2018 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant Karissa Bodnar. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/9/2018, (Devlin, John)
October 18, 2018 10 ANSWER to Complaint; by Thrive Causemetics, Inc..(Devlin, John)
October 18, 2018 9 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 12/17/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 12/3/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/17/2018, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (KD)
October 18, 2018 8 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Sara M. Barker (Marshall, Toby)
October 10, 2018 7 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SG)
October 10, 2018 Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (SG)
October 5, 2018 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Karissa Bodnar, Thrive Causemetics, Inc. (Devlin, John)
October 5, 2018 5 NOTICE to Plaintiff of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal ; filed by Defendants Karissa Bodnar, Thrive Causemetics, Inc.. (Devlin, John)
October 5, 2018 4 DECLARATION of Erin Wilson in Support of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendants Karissa Bodnar, Thrive Causemetics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Devlin, John)
October 5, 2018 3 DECLARATION of Karissa Bodnar in Support of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendants Karissa Bodnar, Thrive Causemetics, Inc. (Devlin, John)
October 5, 2018 2 DECLARATION of Ned Menninger in Support of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendants Karissa Bodnar, Thrive Causemetics, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exibits A and B)(Devlin, John)
October 5, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 18-2-21685-1; (Receipt # 0981-5499018), filed by Karissa Bodnar, Thrive Causemetics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint)(Devlin, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barker v. Thrive Causemetics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara M. Barker
Represented By: Eric Riley Nusser
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Hanley
Represented By: Toby James Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thrive Causemetics, Inc.
Represented By: John S Devlin, III
Represented By: Taylor Washburn
Represented By: Erin M Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karissa Bodnar
Represented By: John S Devlin, III
Represented By: Taylor Washburn
Represented By: Erin M Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?