Woeck v. ABB, Inc et al

Plaintiff: Michael R. Woeck
Defendant: ABB, Inc., Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc., Zurn Industries, LLC, Occidental Chemical Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Pfizer, Inc., Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, General Electric Company, Hardware Specialty Co., Goulds Pumps (IPG), LLC, Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc., Schneider Electric USA, Inc., Cleaver-Brooks, Inc, General Motors LLC, Plastics Engineering Company, Lone Star Industries, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, AW Chesterton Company, Gould Electronics Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, CBS Corporation, North Coast Electric Company, IMO Industries, Inc., Pfizer Inc, ABB, Inc, Gould Electronics Inc, Hardware Specialty Co, Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc, Lone Star Industries, Inc, IMO Industries, Inc and Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv01472
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 3, 2018 74 RECEIPT from King County Superior Court of #72 Stipulation and Order Remanding Case. (PM)
November 2, 2018 73 LETTER to King County Superior Court Remanding Case to State Court (SWT) (cc: State Court with docket sheet, #72 Order)
November 1, 2018 72 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER to Remand Case to State Court re parties' #68 Stipulation. This case is REMANDED to King County Superior Court. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
November 1, 2018 71 INITIAL DISCLOSURES Filed by Defendant Pfizer, Inc..(Alkhazov, Marissa)
November 1, 2018 70 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Michael R. Woeck, TO RESPONSE to #12 MOTION to Remand (Draper, Glenn)
November 1, 2018 69 INITIAL DISCLOSURES Filed by Plaintiff Michael R. Woeck.(Draper, Glenn)
October 30, 2018 68 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER by parties re #12 MOTION to Remand (Marks, Christopher)
October 30, 2018 67 NOTICE of Withdrawal re #64 Response to Motion ; filed by Defendant CBS Corporation. (Marks, Christopher)
October 29, 2018 66 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal without Prejudice of defendant Zurn Industries, LLC re parties' #65 Stipulation, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (Zurn Industries, LLC terminated.)
October 24, 2018 65 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) Stipulation and Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Zurn Industries, LLC (Eraut, Allen)
October 18, 2018 64 RESPONSE, by Defendant CBS Corporation, to #12 MOTION to Remand . Oral Argument Requested. (Marks, Christopher)
October 18, 2018 63 ANSWER to Complaint; by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Gawlowski, Richard)
October 17, 2018 62 NOTICE of Settlement by Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Tuvim, Mark)
October 17, 2018 61 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Mark B Tuvim on behalf of Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Tuvim, Mark)
October 17, 2018 60 ANSWER to Complaint; by Pfizer, Inc..(Alkhazov, Marissa)
October 17, 2018 59 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by General Electric Company (Serko, Alice)
October 16, 2018 Attorney Megan Uhle for Hardware Specialty Co added; per #57 Praecipe to Attach Document, #58 Praecipe to Attach Document. (SWT)
October 16, 2018 58 PRAECIPE to attach document (Notice of Appearance) re #44 Notice of Appearance by Defendant Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc (Attachments: #1 Signature Page)(Loftis, Jeanne)
October 16, 2018 57 PRAECIPE to attach document (Notice of Appearance) re #46 Notice of Appearance by Defendant Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc Hardware Specialty Co. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page)(Loftis, Jeanne) Modified on 10/16/2018 to edit docket text (TH).
October 15, 2018 56 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Schneider Electric SE, Other Affiliate Schneider Electric Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Schneider Electric Industries SAS, Other Affiliate Electric Holding Amerique du Nord for Schneider Electric USA, Inc.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Schneider Electric USA, Inc. (Shaw, G)
October 15, 2018 55 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney G William Shaw on behalf of Defendant Schneider Electric USA, Inc.. (Shaw, G)
October 15, 2018 54 NOTICE of Settlement by Defendant Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc (Reynolds, Rachel)
October 15, 2018 53 ANSWER to Complaint; by Zurn Industries, LLC.(Eraut, Allen)
October 15, 2018 52 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate National Amusements, Inc., Other Affiliate NAI Entertainment Holdings LLC for CBS Corporation. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by CBS Corporation (Serko, Alice)
October 15, 2018 51 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant CBS Corporation (Attachments: #1 State Court Records)(Serko, Alice)
October 15, 2018 50 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Rexnord LLC for Zurn Industries, LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Zurn Industries, LLC (Eraut, Allen)
October 15, 2018 49 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Allen Eraut on behalf of Defendant Zurn Industries, LLC. (Eraut, Allen)
October 12, 2018 NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The #46 Notice of Appearance, #44 Notice of Appearance was improperly signed by Megan Uhle. As such, one or more attorneys were not added to the case and will not receive future notices until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. Please file corrected signature page using Praecipe to Attach event and link to original filing. (SWT)
October 12, 2018 48 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Hardware Specialty Co (Loftis, Jeanne)
October 12, 2018 47 ANSWER to Complaint; and Affirmative Defenses with JURY DEMAND by Hardware Specialty Co.(Loftis, Jeanne)
October 12, 2018 46 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jeanne F Loftis on behalf of Defendant Hardware Specialty Co. (Loftis, Jeanne)
October 12, 2018 45 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Distribution Holdings Inc., a Delaware corporation for Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc (Loftis, Jeanne)
October 12, 2018 44 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jeanne F Loftis on behalf of Defendant Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc. (Loftis, Jeanne)
October 12, 2018 43 ANSWER to Complaint; and Affirmative Defenses with JURY DEMAND by Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc.(Loftis, Jeanne)
October 12, 2018 42 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Corporate Parent MetLife Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Gawlowski, Richard)
October 12, 2018 41 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Richard G Gawlowski on behalf of Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Gawlowski, Richard)
October 12, 2018 40 ANSWER to Complaint; by ABB, Inc.(Odom, Jeffrey)
October 12, 2018 39 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation, Corporate Parent Colfax Fluid Handling LLC, Corporate Parent IMO Holdings Inc. for IMO Industries, Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by IMO Industries, Inc (Horne, James)
October 12, 2018 38 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney James Edward Horne on behalf of Defendant IMO Industries, Inc. (Horne, James)
October 12, 2018 37 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Plastics Engineering Company (Paal, Zackary)
October 12, 2018 36 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Zackary A Paal on behalf of Defendant Plastics Engineering Company. (Paal, Zackary)
October 12, 2018 35 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Lone Star Industries, Inc (Paal, Zackary)
October 12, 2018 34 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Zackary A Paal on behalf of Defendant Lone Star Industries, Inc. (Paal, Zackary)
October 11, 2018 33 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll Rand PLC for Ingersoll-Rand Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Ingersoll-Rand Company (Tuvim, Mark)
October 11, 2018 32 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Mark B Tuvim on behalf of Defendant Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Tuvim, Mark)
October 11, 2018 31 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 11/8/2018, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
October 11, 2018 30 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by North Coast Electric Company (Steele, Katherine)
October 11, 2018 29 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Katherine M. Steele on behalf of Defendant North Coast Electric Company. (Steele, Katherine)
October 11, 2018 28 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Cleaver-Brooks, Inc (Thorson, Timothy)
October 11, 2018 27 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Timothy Kost Thorson on behalf of Defendant Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. (Thorson, Timothy)
October 11, 2018 NOTICE TO FILER - Jury Demand improperly submitted. Please be advised that when filing a Notice of Removal, if the Jury Demand is indicated only on the Notice of Removal, this does not constitute a proper request for Jury Demand, pursuant to LCR 101(b)(3). Since a separate Jury Demand from state court was properly filed, the Jury Demand entered by the filer has been changed on the docket to reflect plaintiff only. Thank you. (MET)
October 11, 2018 26 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Laura E Kruse on behalf of Defendant AW Chesterton Company. (Kruse, Laura)
October 11, 2018 25 REDACTION to #13 Declaration of Glenn S. Draper by Plaintiff Michael R. Woeck (Draper, Glenn)
October 11, 2018 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by ABB, Inc (Odom, Jeffrey)
October 11, 2018 23 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jeffrey M Odom on behalf of Defendant ABB, Inc. (Odom, Jeffrey)
October 11, 2018 22 NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: #12 MOTION to Remand . Filed by Plaintiff Michael R. Woeck. Noting Date 11/2/2018, (Draper, Glenn)
October 11, 2018 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate Occidental Petroleum Investment Co., Other Affiliate Occidental Petroleum Corporation for Occidental Chemical Corporation. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Occidental Chemical Corporation (Gardner, Ronald)
October 11, 2018 20 ANSWER to Complaint; by Occidental Chemical Corporation.(Gardner, Ronald)
October 11, 2018 19 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ronald C Gardner on behalf of Defendant Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Gardner, Ronald)
October 11, 2018 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate ITT Inc. for Goulds Pumps (IPG), LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Goulds Pumps (IPG), LLC (Gardner, Ronald)
October 11, 2018 17 ANSWER to Complaint; by Goulds Pumps (IPG), LLC.(Gardner, Ronald)
October 11, 2018 16 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ronald C Gardner on behalf of Defendant Goulds Pumps (IPG), LLC. (Gardner, Ronald)
October 11, 2018 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Dow Chemical Company, Corporate Parent DowDuPont Inc. for Union Carbide Corporation. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Union Carbide Corporation (Reynolds, Rachel)
October 11, 2018 14 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney David Corliss on behalf of Plaintiff Michael R. Woeck. (Corliss, David)
October 10, 2018 NOTICE TO FILER: re #13 Declaration. Document(s) contain personal identifiers that must be redacted pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2 and FRCP 5.2. You are required to re-file a redacted version of your document using the event "Redacted Document" located in the Other Documents category. This event will allow you to link back to your original filing and will not affect your original filing date. Pursuant to LCR 5.2 and FRCP 5.2, the document(s) have been administratively sealed by the Court. (SWT)
October 10, 2018 13 SEALED DECLARATION of Glenn S. Draper filed by Plaintiff Michael R. Woeck re #12 MOTION to Remand (Draper, Glenn) Modified on 10/11/2018 to SEAL due to personal identifiers (SWT). Modified on 10/11/2018 to add SEALED (MET).
October 10, 2018 12 MOTION to Remand , filed by Plaintiff Michael R. Woeck. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/26/2018, (Draper, Glenn)
October 10, 2018 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Pfizer, Inc. (Alkhazov, Marissa)
October 10, 2018 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Marissa Alkhazov on behalf of Defendant Pfizer, Inc.. (Alkhazov, Marissa)
October 10, 2018 9 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re: receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (DJ)
October 10, 2018 NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant(s) ABB Inc, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, A.W. Chesterton Company, CBS Corporation, Cleaver-Brooks Inc, Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc, General Electric Company, Goulds Pumps (IPG) LLC, Hardware Specialty Co, IMO Industries Inc, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Lone Star Industries Inc, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, North Coast Electric Company, Occidental Chemical Corporation, Pfizer Inc, Plastics Engineering Company, Schneider Electric USA Inc, Union Carbide Corporation, Zurn Industries LLC must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 10/17/2018. (DJ)
October 10, 2018 8 NOTICE TO FILER: Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (DJ)
October 10, 2018 Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (DJ)
October 10, 2018 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent JX Nippon Mining & Metals Corp. for Gould Electronics Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Gould Electronics Inc (Mattingly, John)
October 10, 2018 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney John Michael Mattingly on behalf of Defendant Gould Electronics Inc. (Mattingly, John)
October 8, 2018 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Matthew Phineas Bergman on behalf of Plaintiff Michael R. Woeck. (Bergman, Matthew)
October 8, 2018 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ruby K. Aliment on behalf of Plaintiff Michael R. Woeck. (Aliment, Ruby)
October 8, 2018 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Glenn S Draper on behalf of Plaintiff Michael R. Woeck. (Draper, Glenn)
October 5, 2018 2 DECLARATION of Alice C. Serko re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant CBS Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Serko, Alice)
October 5, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 18-2-19966-3 SEA; (Receipt # 0981-5499131), filed by CBS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Jury Demand, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Serko, Alice)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woeck v. ABB, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABB, Inc.
Represented By: Katie Bass
Represented By: Jeffrey M Odom
Represented By: Brian D Zeringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc.
Represented By: Jeanne F Loftis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurn Industries, LLC
Represented By: Allen Eraut
Represented By: John Michael Mattingly
Represented By: Shaun Mary Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Occidental Chemical Corporation
Represented By: Ronald C Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Trevor J. Mohr
Represented By: Mark B Tuvim
Represented By: Kevin J Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Ann Albrecht
Represented By: Marissa Alkhazov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Trevor J. Mohr
Represented By: Mark B Tuvim
Represented By: Kevin J Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Represented By: Alice Coles Serko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hardware Specialty Co.
Represented By: Jeanne F Loftis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps (IPG), LLC
Represented By: Ronald C Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc.
Represented By: Barry Neal Mesher
Represented By: Rachel Tallon Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider Electric USA, Inc.
Represented By: G William Shaw
Represented By: Ryan J Groshong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks, Inc
Represented By: Timothy Kost Thorson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plastics Engineering Company
Represented By: J. Scott Wood
Represented By: Zackary A Paal
Represented By: R Dirk Bernhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lone Star Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Howard (Terry) I. Hall
Represented By: Zackary A Paal
Represented By: Melissa K Roeder
Represented By: Brian Bernard Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard G Gawlowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AW Chesterton Company
Represented By: Laura E Kruse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gould Electronics Inc.
Represented By: John Michael Mattingly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: George S. Pitcher
Represented By: Rachel Tallon Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Christopher S Marks
Represented By: Malika Johnson
Represented By: Alice Coles Serko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Coast Electric Company
Represented By: Aleksander Richard Schilbach
Represented By: Katherine M. Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Edward Ricketts
Represented By: James Edward Horne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc
Represented By: Emily Ann Albrecht
Represented By: Marissa Alkhazov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABB, Inc
Represented By: Katie Bass
Represented By: Jeffrey M Odom
Represented By: Brian D Zeringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gould Electronics Inc
Represented By: John Michael Mattingly
Represented By: Allen Eraut
Represented By: Shaun Mary Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hardware Specialty Co
Represented By: Jeanne F Loftis
Represented By: Megan Uhle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc
Represented By: Barry Neal Mesher
Represented By: Rachel Tallon Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lone Star Industries, Inc
Represented By: Howard (Terry) I. Hall
Represented By: Zackary A Paal
Represented By: Melissa K Roeder
Represented By: Brian Bernard Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc
Represented By: Michael Edward Ricketts
Represented By: James Edward Horne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc
Represented By: Jeanne F Loftis
Represented By: Megan Uhle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael R. Woeck
Represented By: Matthew Phineas Bergman
Represented By: Ruby K. Aliment
Represented By: Glenn S Draper
Represented By: David Corliss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?