Navarro v. Uttecht

Petitioner: Pedro Navarro
Respondent: Jeffrey Uttecht and Jeffrey A Uttecht
Case Number: 2:2018cv01479
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
0 Judge: John C Coughenour
1 Judge: Mary Alice Theiler
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 7, 2018 16 RESPONSE, by Respondent Jeffrey A Uttecht, to #13 MOTION to Prevent Public Notification of his Release Under Sex Offender Status Until this Court Decides the Petition. **PRINT ALL**(Pedro Navarro, Prisoner ID: 368301)(Samson, John)
November 28, 2018 15 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Petitioner Pedro Navarro. Noted by Clerk for 12/14/2018, **12 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Pedro Navarro, Prisoner ID: 368301) (TH)
November 26, 2018 14 Featured Case ORDER denying Petitioner's #7 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Pedro Navarro, Prisoner ID: 368301) (TH)
November 26, 2018 13 MOTION to Prevent Public Notification of his Release Under Sex Offender Status Until this Court Decides the Petition, filed by Petitioner Pedro Navarro. Noted by Clerk for 12/14/2018, **12 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Pedro Navarro, Prisoner ID: 368301) (TH)
November 14, 2018 12 RESPONSE, by Respondent Jeffrey A Uttecht, to #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. **PRINT ALL**(Pedro Navarro, Prisoner ID: 368301)(Samson, John)
November 14, 2018 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney John Joseph Samson on behalf of Respondent Jeffrey A Uttecht. **PRINT ALL**(Pedro Navarro, Prisoner ID: 368301)(Samson, John)
November 13, 2018 10 REQUEST by Petitioner Pedro Navarro for Status of Motions re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, #4 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)**4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Pedro Navarro, Prisoner ID: 368301)(SWT)
November 9, 2018 Noting Date Set/Reset re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Noting Date 12/7/2018, **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Pedro Navarro, Prisoner ID: 368301)(ST)
November 9, 2018 9 Featured Case ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF 2254 PETITION AND MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. Documents served electronically to Attorney General of the State of Washington on 11/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Pro Se Instruction Sheet)**5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Pedro Navarro, Prisoner ID: 368301)(ST)
November 9, 2018 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Petitioner Pedro Navarro. **10 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Pedro Navarro, Prisoner ID: 368301)(ST)
November 9, 2018 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Petitioner Pedro Navarro. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)**9 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Pedro Navarro, Prisoner ID: 368301)(ST)
November 9, 2018 6 2254 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Pedro Navarro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)**49 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Pedro Navarro, Prisoner ID: 368301)(ST)
November 9, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler.**1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Pedro Navarro, Prisoner ID: 368301)(ST)
October 23, 2018 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Pedro Navarro. (Attachments: #1 Prison Trust Account Statement, #2 Proposed Petition for Writ Of Habeas Corpus, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Motion for Preliminary Injunction)**63 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Pedro Navarro, Prisoner ID: 368301)(SG)
October 23, 2018 IFP deficiency corrected **DO NOT PRINT**(Pedro Navarro, Prisoner ID: 368301)(SG)
October 10, 2018 3 LETTER mailed re IFP deficiency; - The financial officer of the facility where you are housed must complete the "Certification" box on the second page of the IFP. A copy of the original IFP form submitted is attached for your convenience. Filer has until 11/9/2018 to correct (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Pedro Navarro, Prisoner ID: 368301)(ST)
October 9, 2018 NOTICE TO FILER: The court received a duplicate set of initial documents from the petitioner (61 pages and 62 pages). After reviewing both sets of documents, it was discovered that the second page of the IFP was included in the filing of 62 pages. The clerk posted the documents with 62 pages. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Pedro Navarro, Prisoner ID: 368301)(ST)
October 9, 2018 1 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Petitioner Pedro Navarro (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Exhibit, #3 PROPOSED Motion for Appointment of Counsel, #4 Declaration in Support of Motion for Appointment of Counsel, #5 Prison Trust Account)**62 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Pedro Navarro, Prisoner ID: 368301)(ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Navarro v. Uttecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Pedro Navarro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeffrey Uttecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeffrey A Uttecht
Represented By: John Joseph Samson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?