Truxedo, Inc. et al v. Tyger Auto, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Extang Corp. and Truxedo, Inc.
Defendant: John Doe Corporations, Tyger Auto, Inc. and John Doe Corporations 1-5
Case Number: 2:2018cv01498
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 7, 2018 31 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 5 days. (Harris, Emily)
December 4, 2018 30 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER extending the Initial Disclosure Deadline to 12/4/2018. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
November 29, 2018 29 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Ambika K Doran. Filed by Defendant Tyger Auto, Inc.. (Doran, Ambika)
November 28, 2018 28 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR INITIAL DISCLOSURES by parties (Doran, Ambika)
November 21, 2018 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Tyger Auto, Inc..(Doran, Ambika)
November 1, 2018 26 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Deadline re parties' #21 Stipulation: Defendant's deadline to respond to Complaint is extended to 11/21/2018, by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SWT)
November 1, 2018 25 Featured Case ORDER re #23 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Cristina Q Almendarez for Defendant Tyger Auto, Inc., by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
November 1, 2018 24 Featured Case ORDER re #22 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Deborah J Swedlow for Defendant Tyger Auto, Inc., by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
October 31, 2018 23 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Cristina Q. Almendarez FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Tyger Auto, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5528038 (Doran, Ambika)
October 31, 2018 22 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Deborah J. Swedlow FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Tyger Auto, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5528036 (Doran, Ambika)
October 31, 2018 21 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by parties (Doran, Ambika)
October 31, 2018 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Lymax Holdings Limited, Corporate Parent Asgard Pacific Holdings Ltd. for Tyger Auto, Inc.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Tyger Auto, Inc. (Doran, Ambika)
October 31, 2018 19 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ambika K Doran on behalf of Defendant Tyger Auto, Inc.. (Doran, Ambika)
October 26, 2018 18 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 12/7/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 11/23/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/30/2018, by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW)
October 19, 2018 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Tyger Auto, Inc. on 10/17/2018, filed by Plaintiffs Extang Corp., Truxedo, Inc.. (Harris, Emily)
October 17, 2018 16 Amended Summons issued as to Defendant Tyger Auto, Inc. (SWT)
October 16, 2018 15 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiffs Extang Corp., Truxedo, Inc. (Harris, Emily)
October 15, 2018 14 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office (ST)
October 15, 2018 13 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action re TruXedo. Mailed to the US Copyright Office. (ST) (Main Document 13 replaced on 10/16/2018) (ST).
October 15, 2018 12 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action re Extang Corporation. Mailed to the US Copyright Office. (ST)
October 12, 2018 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Eric A Lindberg on behalf of Plaintiffs Extang Corp., Truxedo, Inc.. (Lindberg, Eric)
October 12, 2018 10 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiffs Extang Corp., Truxedo, Inc. (Harris, Emily)
October 12, 2018 9 Featured Case ORDER re #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Roberto M Braceros Braceras for Extang Corp. and Truxedo, Inc., by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA) Modified on 10/12/2018 correct spelling of PHV attorney's name (CDA).
October 12, 2018 8 Featured Case ORDER re #3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Todd Marabella for Extang Corp.,Todd Marabella for Truxedo, Inc., by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
October 12, 2018 7 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (Ad Hoc, Eric Lindberg) (ST)
October 12, 2018 6 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Tyger Auto, Inc. (ST)
October 12, 2018 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (ST)
October 12, 2018 5 **DISREGARD** CIVIL COVER SHEET ; filed by Plaintiffs Extang Corp., Truxedo, Inc.. (Harris, Emily) Modified on 10/12/2018. Per counsel, CCS filed in incorrect case. (ST)
October 12, 2018 4 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY ROBERTO M. BRACERAS FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Extang Corp., Truxedo, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5505773 (Harris, Emily)
October 12, 2018 3 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY TODD MARABELLA FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Extang Corp., Truxedo, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5505730 (Harris, Emily)
October 11, 2018 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Tectum Holdings, Inc. for Extang Corp., Truxedo, Inc.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Extang Corp., Truxedo, Inc. (Harris, Emily)
October 11, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) All Plaintiffs (Receipt # 0981-5505165) Attorney Emily J Harris added to party Extang Corp.(pty:pla), Attorney Emily J Harris added to party Truxedo, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Truxedo, Inc., Extang Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Summons)(Harris, Emily)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Truxedo, Inc. et al v. Tyger Auto, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyger Auto, Inc.
Represented By: Cristina Q Almendarez
Represented By: Deborah J Swedlow
Represented By: Ambika K Doran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporations 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Extang Corp.
Represented By: Emily J Harris
Represented By: Todd Marabella
Represented By: Roberto M Braceras
Represented By: Eric A Lindberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Truxedo, Inc.
Represented By: Emily J Harris
Represented By: Todd Marabella
Represented By: Roberto M Braceras
Represented By: Eric A Lindberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?