Diaw v. Katie Ann LLC et al

Plaintiff: Saliou Diaw
Defendant: Katie Ann LLC, American Seafoods Company, LLC, American Seafoods Group LLC and American Seafoods Group
Case Number: 2:2018cv01499
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:688
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 19, 2018 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint for Damages by American Seafoods Company, LLC, American Seafoods Group, Katie Ann LLC.(McVittie, Eric)
November 8, 2018 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by American Seafoods Company, LLC, American Seafoods Group, Katie Ann LLC (McVittie, Eric)
November 8, 2018 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Eric R McVittie on behalf of Defendants American Seafoods Company, LLC, American Seafoods Group, Katie Ann LLC. (McVittie, Eric)
October 25, 2018 6 MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case, or that attorney's representative, should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation; If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, local counsel should attend on behalf of non-local counsel. If local counsel is unavailable, non-local counsel may make arrangements to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at Paul_Pierson@wawd.uscourts.gov at least TEN (10) DAYS in advance of the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. A Status Conference is ordered set for 2/5/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
October 15, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
October 12, 2018 4 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) American Seafoods Company, LLC, American Seafoods Group, Katie Ann LLC. (SNP)
October 12, 2018 U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour added. (SNP)
October 11, 2018 3 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (SNP)
October 11, 2018 2 COMPLAINT Civil Cover Sheet, Summons, and Praecipe against All Defendants, filed by Saliou Diaw. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Praecipe)(Hackler, Jacqueline) (Fee Waived)
October 11, 2018 1 COMPLAINT Saliou Diaw's Seaman Complaint for Damages against All Defendants, filed by Saliou Diaw.(Hackler, Jacqueline) (Fee Waived)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diaw v. Katie Ann LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katie Ann LLC
Represented By: Eric R McVittie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Seafoods Company, LLC
Represented By: Eric R McVittie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Seafoods Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Seafoods Group
Represented By: Eric R McVittie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saliou Diaw
Represented By: Jacqueline Hackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?