State Farm Fire & Casualty Company v. Harvey et al

Plaintiff: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Defendant: Kathleen Harvey and R.R.
Case Number: 2:2018cv01505
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 4, 2018 Attorney Kevin M. Hastings for R.R. added; per #8 Notice of Appearance. (TH)
December 4, 2018 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Darrell L Cochran on behalf of Defendant R.R.. (Cochran, Darrell)
December 4, 2018 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Darrell L Cochran on behalf of Defendant R.R.. (Cochran, Darrell)
November 7, 2018 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Kathleen Harvey mailed on 10/16/2018 (DeYoung, Mary)
October 25, 2018 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant R.R. mailed on 10/16/2018 (DeYoung, Mary)
October 25, 2018 5 MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case, or that attorney's representative, should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation; If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, local counsel should attend on behalf of non-local counsel. If local counsel is unavailable, non-local counsel may make arrangements to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at Paul_Pierson@wawd.uscourts.gov at least TEN (10) DAYS in advance of the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. A Status Conference is ordered set for 2/5/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
October 17, 2018 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company (DeYoung, Mary)
October 16, 2018 3 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
October 15, 2018 2 Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendants Kathleen Harvey and R.R. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(GT)
October 15, 2018 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 10/22/2018. (GT)
October 15, 2018 U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour added. (GT)
October 15, 2018 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief against All Defendants Attorney Mary R DeYoung added to party State Farm Fire & Casualty Company(pty:pla), filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(DeYoung, Mary) (Receipt # 0981-5506500) Modified on 10/15/2018 (PS).
October 15, 2018 Civil Case administratively terminated; opened in error. (GT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company v. Harvey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.R.
Represented By: Darrell L Cochran
Represented By: Kevin M. Hastings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Represented By: Paul Mark Rosner
Represented By: Mary R DeYoung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?