The Highlands North Condominium Association v. Allstate Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: The Highlands North Condominium Association
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company, American Casualty Company of Reading, PA, American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Fire & Casualty Company and Doe Insurance Companies 1-10
Case Number: 2:2018cv01506
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 18, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 12/17/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 12/3/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/17/2018, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (KD)
October 18, 2018 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by The Highlands North Condominium Association (Burns, Jessica)
October 15, 2018 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Allstate Insurance Company, American Casualty Company of Reading, PA, American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company, Safeco Insurance Company of America, State Farm Fire & Casualty Company (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(SNP)
October 15, 2018 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 10/22/2018. (SNP)
October 15, 2018 Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (SNP)
October 12, 2018 1 COMPLAINT Declaratory Relief and Monetary Damages against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5506637) Attorney Jessica Burns added to party The Highlands North Condominium Association(pty:pla), filed by The Highlands North Condominium Association. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Allstate, #3 Summons American Casualty Company of Reading, #4 Summons State Farm, #5 Summons Safeco, #6 Summons American Guarantee)(Burns, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Highlands North Condominium Association v. Allstate Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Casualty Company of Reading, PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Insurance Companies 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Highlands North Condominium Association
Represented By: Jessica Burns
Represented By: Daniel Stein
Represented By: Daniel S Houser
Represented By: Justin D Sudweeks
Represented By: Jerry H. Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?