In re: Boris Izrailyevich Povzner

Plaintiff: Bankruptcy Appeals (SEA)
Appellant: Dom One Estates Irrevocable Trust, Boris Izrailyevich Povzner and Eugene Povzner
Appellee: Springer Development LLC, Banner Bank, Pomaikai LLC, Joseph T Hunt and Nationstar Mortgage
Trustee: Jason Wilson-Aguilar
Case Number: 2:2018cv01513
Filed: October 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting Appellees' #8 Motion to Dismiss Appeal. This appeal is dismissed as untimely. This case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez.(PM) cc: Appellants via first class mail
November 30, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Non-Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Bankruptcy Appeal ; filed by Appellee Banner Bank. (DuBay, Eleanor)
October 30, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Bankruptcy Appeal, filed by Appellees Banner Bank, Joseph T Hunt, Springer Development LLC. Noting Date 11/30/2018, (DuBay, Eleanor)
October 22, 2018 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Banner Bank, Corporate Parent Banner Corporation for Springer Development LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Springer Development LLC (DuBay, Eleanor)
October 22, 2018 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Banner Corporation for Banner Bank. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Banner Bank (DuBay, Eleanor)
October 22, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Eleanor A DuBay on behalf of Appellees Banner Bank, Joseph T Hunt, Springer Development LLC. (DuBay, Eleanor)
October 22, 2018 NOTICE/FILING FEE received by Bankruptcy Court per docket provided (CDA)
October 19, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Lisa McMahon-Myhran on behalf of Interested Party Jason Wilson-Aguilar. (McMahon-Myhran, Lisa)
October 17, 2018 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Banner Bank must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 10/24/2018. (CDA)
October 17, 2018 Filing 3 Record Status Request Regarding Bankruptcy Appeal. Please forward a copy of the statement of issues, designation of record, and the Certificate of record to us when the record required by FRBP 8007 is completed. If completion of the record has been delayed, please advise us as to the cause of the delay by 11/16/2018. (CDA) Modified on 10/17/2018 to add language from letter and cc to pro se appellants via US Mail (CDA
October 17, 2018 Filing 2 LETTER re Filing of Bankruptcy Appeal (CDA)cc pro se appellants via US Mail
October 16, 2018 Filing 1 TRANSMITTAL OF DOCUMENTS for Appeal from USBC Seattle. USBC case #18-11823 TWD, Internal USBC #18-S011, filed by Bankruptcy Appeals (Sea) (Bankruptcy Appeals (Sea), )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Boris Izrailyevich Povzner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Dom One Estates Irrevocable Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Boris Izrailyevich Povzner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Eugene Povzner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Springer Development LLC
Represented By: Eleanor A DuBay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Banner Bank
Represented By: Eleanor A Martin
Represented By: Eleanor A DuBay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Pomaikai LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Joseph T Hunt
Represented By: Joseph Taylor Hunt
Represented By: Eleanor A DuBay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Nationstar Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bankruptcy Appeals (SEA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Jason Wilson-Aguilar
Represented By: Lisa McMahon-Myhran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?