Rubie's Costume Company, Inc. v. Yiwu Hua Hao Toys Co., Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Rubie's Costume Company, Inc.
Defendant: John Does 1-100, Trend Nation, LLC and Yiwu Hua Hao Toys Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2018cv01530
Filed: October 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Filing 13 REPLY, filed by Defendant Trend Nation, LLC, TO RESPONSE to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, or in the Alternative, Transfer to the District of Nevada (Hawk, Christopher)
December 4, 2018 Attorney W Greg Lockwood for Trend Nation, LLC added; per #12 Notice of Appearance. (TH)
December 4, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christopher E. Hawk on behalf of Defendant Trend Nation, LLC. (Hawk, Christopher)
December 3, 2018 Filing 11 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Rubie's Costume Company, Inc., to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, or in the Alternative, Transfer to the District of Nevada. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Roller, Jeremy)
November 12, 2018 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Bradley Howard In Support of Trend National's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Trend Nation, LLC re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, or in the Alternative, Transfer to the District of Nevada (Hawk, Christopher)
November 12, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, or in the Alternative, Transfer to the District of Nevada, filed by Defendant Trend Nation, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/7/2018, (Hawk, Christopher)
November 12, 2018 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Trend Nation, LLC (Hawk, Christopher)
November 1, 2018 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Trend Nation, LLC on 10/22/2018, filed by Plaintiff Rubie's Costume Company, Inc.. (Roller, Jeremy)
October 22, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:18-cv-01531-BJR; 2:18-cv-01532-RAJ, by Plaintiff Rubie's Costume Company, Inc.. (Roller, Jeremy)
October 19, 2018 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
October 19, 2018 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Mailed to the US Copyright Office (SNP)
October 19, 2018 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Trend Nation, LLC, Yiwu Hua Hao Toys Co., Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(SNP)
October 19, 2018 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (SNP)
October 18, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Rubie's Costume Company, Inc. (Roller, Jeremy)
October 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) John Does 1-100, Trend Nation, LLC, Yiwu Hua Hao Toys Co., Ltd. (Receipt # 0981-5512156) Attorney Jeremy E Roller added to party Rubie's Costume Company, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Rubie's Costume Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Yiwu Hua Hao Toys Co., Ltd., #3 Summons Trend Nation, LLC, #4 Report on Copyrights (AO Form 121))(Roller, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rubie's Costume Company, Inc. v. Yiwu Hua Hao Toys Co., Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trend Nation, LLC
Represented By: Christopher E. Hawk
Represented By: W Greg Lockwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yiwu Hua Hao Toys Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rubie's Costume Company, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy E Roller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?