Ruiz v. Younguist et al

Plaintiff: Jesse Z Ruiz
Defendant: Chief Marlow, Suzanne Lane, Jeanne Younguist, Skagit County Jail, Ken Dahlstedt, County of Skagit and Don Marlow
Case Number: 2:2018cv01545
Filed: October 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Referring Judge: Mary Alice Theiler
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Plaintiff Jesse Z Ruiz. (ST)
December 10, 2018 ***Deadlines/Hearings terminated. (ST)
December 10, 2018 Filing 6 AMENDED 1983 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT, filed by Jesse Z Ruiz against defendant(s) County of Skagit, Ken Dahlstedt, Don Marlow, Skagit County Jail, Jeanne Younguist with JURY DEMAND. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ST)
November 9, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/10/2018. (ST)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DECLINING TO SERVE #4 COMPLAINT AND GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. Plaintiff's #1 Motion for a TRO and/or preliminary injunction is STRICKEN. (cc: plaintiff via USPS w/amended complaint form. (ST)
November 9, 2018 Filing 4 1983 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT, filed by Jesse Z Ruiz against defendant(s) Suzanne Lane, Marlow, Jeanne Younguist with JURY DEMAND (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ST)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (cc: plaintiff; Skagit County Justice Department via USPS)(ST)
October 19, 2018 Filing 2 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (SG)
October 18, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Jesse Z Ruiz. (Attachments: #1 Proposed 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #4 Prison Trust Account Statement)(SG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruiz v. Younguist et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Marlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanne Younguist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skagit County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Dahlstedt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Skagit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Marlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Z Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?