Ledezma v. Youngquist et al

Plaintiff: Alberto Ledezma
Defendant: Chief Don Marlow, Commissioner Ken Dahlstedt and Jeanne Youngquist
Case Number: 2:2018cv01553
Filed: October 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Referring Judge: Mary Alice Theiler
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Service by U.S. Mail re #14 Notice-Other, #12 MOTION to Dismiss Party Kenneth Dahlstedt, #11 Declaration, #10 MOTION to Dismiss Party Jeanne Youngquist, #13 Declaration by Defendants Ken Dahlstedt, Jeanne Youngquist (Denny, Arne)
November 27, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE Regarding Dispositive Motions re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Party Kenneth Dahlstedt, #11 Declaration, #10 MOTION to Dismiss Party Jeanne Youngquist, #13 Declaration ; filed by Defendants Ken Dahlstedt, Jeanne Youngquist. (Denny, Arne)
November 27, 2018 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Kenneth Dahlstedt filed by Defendant Ken Dahlstedt re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Party Kenneth Dahlstedt (Denny, Arne)
November 27, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Party Kenneth Dahlstedt, filed by Defendant Ken Dahlstedt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint) Noting Date 12/28/2018, (Denny, Arne)
November 27, 2018 Filing 11 DECLARATION filed by Defendant Jeanne Youngquist re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Party Jeanne Youngquist (Denny, Arne)
November 27, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Party Jeanne Youngquist, filed by Defendant Jeanne Youngquist. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/28/2018, (Denny, Arne)
November 9, 2018 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Jeanne Youngquist mailed on 10/31/2018 (SWT)
November 9, 2018 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Don Marlow mailed on 10/31/2018 (SWT)
November 9, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons upon defendant Ken Dahlstedt mailed on 10/31/2018 (SWT)
November 6, 2018 Attorney Erik Pedersen for Ken Dahlstedt,Erik Pedersen for Don Marlow,Erik Pedersen for Jeanne Youngquist added; per #6 Notice of Appearance. (TH)
November 6, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Arne O Denny on behalf of Defendants Ken Dahlstedt, Don Marlow, Jeanne Youngquist. (Denny, Arne)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. Served by 1st Class Mail to Jeanne Youngquist; Chief Don Marlow; Commissioner Ken Dahlstedt on 10/31/2018. (cc: plaintiff; Skagit County Prosecutor's Office)(ST)
October 30, 2018 Filing 4 1983 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT, filed by Alberto Ledezma against defendant(s) Ken Dahlstedt, Don Marlow, Jeanne Youngquist with JURY DEMAND (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ST)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS by Judge Mary Alice Theiler. (cc: Plaintiff, WAWD Finance, Skagit County Jail)(ST)
October 18, 2018 Filing 2 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (cc: plaintiff via USPS) (ST)
October 18, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Theiler, filed by Alberto Ledezma. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Exhibit, #3 Prison Trust Account)(ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ledezma v. Youngquist et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alberto Ledezma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Don Marlow
Represented By: Arne O Denny
Represented By: Erik Pedersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Ken Dahlstedt
Represented By: Arne O Denny
Represented By: Erik Pedersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanne Youngquist
Represented By: Arne O Denny
Represented By: Erik Pedersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?