Bartlett v. Penzone

Petitioner: Alan Michael Bartlett
Respondent: Paul Penzone
Case Number: 2:2018cv01574
Filed: October 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
0 Judge: James P Donohue
1 Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Donohue, filed by Alan Michael Bartlett. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Exhibit, #3 Prison Trust Account)(ST)
December 17, 2018 IFP deficiency corrected re #7 IFP Deficiency Letter (ST)
December 6, 2018 Filing 7 LETTER mailed re IFP deficiency; - Please provide a certified copy of your prison trust account statement showing transactions for the last six months. Filer has until 1/7/2019 to correct (SG)
December 3, 2018 Filing 8 MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENT re #6 IFP Deficiency Corrected ; filed by Petitioner Alan Michael Bartlett. Proof of Service attached. (SG)
December 3, 2018 Filing 6 IFP deficiency corrected IN PART re #5 IFP Deficiency Letter, Plaintiff submitted completed IFP Application. Prison Trust Account Statement not received. New IFP Deficiency letter to be sent.(SG)
November 23, 2018 Filing 5 LETTER mailed re IFP deficiency; - The proper IFP form was not submitted. Enclosed please find the correct IFP form to be filled out in full and returned to the Court.- Please provide a certified copy of your prison trust account statement showing transactions for the last six months. Filer has until 12/24/2018 to correct. (ST)
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 LETTER from petitioner Alan Michael Bartlett re status of case. (Petitioner provided wrong address on #1 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. The clerk confirmed the address provided by the petitioner on the letter is the correct one for the Lower Buckeye Jail. Per direction of pro se law clerk, a new IFP Deficiency Letter will be sent to the petitioner via USPS.)(ST)
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 Mail addressed to Alan Bartlett returned as Undeliverable re #2 IFP Deficiency Letter, (SG)
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 LETTER mailed re IFP deficiency; - The proper IFP form was not submitted. Enclosed please find the correct IFP form to be filled out in full and returned to the Court.- Please provide a certified copy of your prison trust account statement showing transactions for the last six months. Filer has until 11/28/2018 to correct (ST)
October 25, 2018 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed Informa Pauperis by Petitioner Alan Michael Bartlett (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Exhibit, #3 Letter from Filer)(ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bartlett v. Penzone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Paul Penzone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alan Michael Bartlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?