Wood v. Restaurant Group Inc

Plaintiff: Edmund J Wood
Defendant: Restaurant Group Inc
Interested Party: Bankruptcy Withdrawal of Reference (SEA)
Case Number: 2:2018cv01593
Filed: November 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Restaurant Group Inc (Bailey, Donald)
November 2, 2018 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 11/9/2018. (SG)
November 2, 2018 Filing 2 Letter from Clerk's Office to counsel advising of District Court case number, judge assignment re #1 MOTION to Withdraw the Reference. (SG)
November 2, 2018 Honorable Richard A Jones added to case. (SG)
November 1, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION to Withdraw the Reference (fee not required), filed by Defendant Restaurant Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Record on Appeal) Noting Date 11/2/2018, (Bankruptcy Clerk (Sea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wood v. Restaurant Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Bankruptcy Withdrawal of Reference (SEA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edmund J Wood
Represented By: Denice Elizabeth Moewes
Represented By: Alan Jay Wenokur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Restaurant Group Inc
Represented By: Donald A. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?