New Summit Partner Corp. v. Cornwall, LLC et al

Plaintiff: New Summit Partner Corp.
Defendant: Cornwall, LLC, Gerald Rideout and Kim Rideout
Case Number: 2:2018cv01599
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's #10 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Request for a hearing. The motion for TRO is DENIED, and the request for hearing is GRANTED in accordance with the Court's order. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
December 20, 2018 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Gerald Rideout filed by Defendants Cornwall, LLC, Gerald Rideout, Kim Rideout re #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B)(Juhl, Hans)
December 20, 2018 Filing 13 RESPONSE, by Defendants Cornwall, LLC, Gerald Rideout, Kim Rideout, to #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying TRO)(Juhl, Hans)
December 18, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Intent to Oppose Plaintiff's Motion for TRO re #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ; filed by Defendants Cornwall, LLC, Gerald Rideout, Kim Rideout. (Juhl, Hans)
December 18, 2018 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Sean V. Small filed by Plaintiff New Summit Partner Corp. re #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Small, Sean)
December 18, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , filed by Plaintiff New Summit Partner Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/18/2018, (Small, Sean)
December 11, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Cornwall, LLC, Gerald Rideout, Kim Rideout.(Juhl, Hans)
November 28, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff New Summit Partner Corp. re #1 Complaint, (Small, Sean)
November 28, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff New Summit Partner Corp. re #1 Complaint, (Small, Sean)
November 16, 2018 Attorney Madeline S. Davis for Cornwall, LLC,Madeline S. Davis for Gerald Rideout,Madeline S. Davis for Kim Rideout added; per #6 Notice of Appearance. (TH)
November 16, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Hans P Juhl on behalf of Defendants Cornwall, LLC, Gerald Rideout, Kim Rideout. (Juhl, Hans)
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by New Summit Partner Corp. (Small, Sean)
November 7, 2018 Filing 4 MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case, or that attorney's representative, should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation; If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, local counsel should attend on behalf of non-local counsel. If local counsel is unavailable, non-local counsel may make arrangements to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at Paul_Pierson@wawd.uscourts.gov at least TEN (10) DAYS in advance of the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. A Status Conference is ordered set for 2/19/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
November 5, 2018 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Cornwall, LLC, Gerald Rideout and Kim Rideout (SNP)
November 5, 2018 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 11/13/2018. (SNP)
November 5, 2018 U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour added. (SNP)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5530005) Attorney Sean Vincent Small added to party New Summit Partner Corp.(pty:pla), filed by New Summit Partner Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Small, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New Summit Partner Corp. v. Cornwall, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornwall, LLC
Represented By: Madeline S. Davis
Represented By: Hans P Juhl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Rideout
Represented By: Madeline S. Davis
Represented By: Hans P Juhl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Rideout
Represented By: Madeline S. Davis
Represented By: Hans P Juhl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Summit Partner Corp.
Represented By: Paul J Spadafora
Represented By: Sean Vincent Small
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?