St. Germain v. Treif USA, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Rudy St. Germain
Defendant: Treif Maschinebau GMBH, Treif USA, Inc., Treif USA and Treif Maschinenbau GMBH
Case Number: 2:2018cv01600
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Filing 6 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 7-9. Filed by Plaintiff Rudy St. Germain.(O'Brien, Marta)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 12/31/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 12/17/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/24/2018, by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (LW)
November 13, 2018 Attorney Gabriella Wagner for Treif Maschinenbau GMBH, Gabriella Wagner for Treif USA, Gabriella Wagner for Treif USA, Inc. added; per #4 Notice of Appearance. (TH)
November 13, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Whitney Smith on behalf of Defendants Treif Maschinenbau GMBH, Treif USA, Treif USA, Inc.. (Smith, Whitney)
November 5, 2018 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Treif Maschinenbau GMBH, Treif USA, Treif USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(SNP)
November 5, 2018 Judge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (SNP)
November 2, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint, ; filed by Plaintiff Rudy St. Germain. (Lebank, Micah)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5530045) Attorney Micah R Lebank added to party Rudy St. Germain(pty:pla), filed by Rudy St. Germain. (Attachments: #1 Summons Treif USA, #2 Summons Treif Maschinebau)(Lebank, Micah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. Germain v. Treif USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rudy St. Germain
Represented By: Micah R Lebank
Represented By: Marta Lynn O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Treif Maschinebau GMBH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Treif USA, Inc.
Represented By: Gabriella Wagner
Represented By: Whitney Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Treif USA
Represented By: Gabriella Wagner
Represented By: Whitney Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Treif Maschinenbau GMBH
Represented By: Gabriella Wagner
Represented By: Whitney Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?