Smith v. Biona US, LLC

Plaintiff: Brad Smith
Defendant: Biona US, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv01606
Filed: November 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending deadline for the Combined Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan from 1/7/2019 to 2/11/2019. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
December 19, 2018 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order (Thal, Spencer)
December 18, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Brad Smith by Biona US, LLC.(Salazar, Gretchen)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge James L. Robart. Joint Status Report due by 1/7/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 12/17/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/31/2018. (AD)
November 29, 2018 Attorney Kasey D Huebner for Biona US, LLC added; per #5 Notice of Appearance. (SWT)
November 29, 2018 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Biona US, LLC (Salazar, Gretchen)
November 29, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Gretchen G Salazar on behalf of Defendant Biona US, LLC. (Salazar, Gretchen)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Charles Ryan Morgan for Plaintiff Brad Smith, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
November 6, 2018 Filing 3 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Charles Ryan Morgan FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Brad Smith (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5533779 (Thal, Spencer)
November 5, 2018 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Biona US, LLC (SG)
November 5, 2018 Judge James L. Robart added. (SG)
November 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Biona US, LLC with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5531297), filed by Brad Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Thal, Spencer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Biona US, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biona US, LLC
Represented By: Gretchen G Salazar
Represented By: Kasey D Huebner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad Smith
Represented By: Spencer Nathan Thal
Represented By: Charles Ryan Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?