Smith v. Amazon

Plaintiff: Charmane Smith
Defendant: Amazon
Case Number: 2:2018cv01607
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Declining to serve Plaintiff's complaint, but GRANTS her leave to file an amended complaint curing the deficiencies within 21 days after the date this order is signed. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH) (cc: Plaintiff served via first class mail a copy of this order and form to file an amended complaint)
November 8, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Plaintiff Charmane Smith. Noted by Clerk for 11/23/2018, (TH)
November 8, 2018 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against defendant Amazon with JURY DEMAND, filed by Charmane Smith. (TH)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (TH) (cc: Plaintiff via first class mail)
November 6, 2018 Filing 3 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. -PLEASE NOTE: The summons that was submitted was not completely filled out. Please fill out the highlighted sections on the enclosed copy of the summons and return it to the Clerk's Office.- (CDA)cc plaintiff via US Mail
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Mary Alice Theiler, filed by Charmane Smith. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Application for Court-Appointed Counsel)(CDA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Amazon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charmane Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?