Johnson v. Costco Wholesale Corporation et al

Plaintiff: James Johnson
Defendant: W Craig Jelinek, Costco Wholesale Corporation and Richard A Galanti
Case Number: 2:2018cv01611
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Attorney Gregory Lewis Watts for Costco Wholesale Corporation, Richard A Galanti, W Craig Jelinek added; per #4 Notice of Appearance. (SWT)
January 2, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation, Richard A Galanti, W Craig Jelinek (Kaplan, Barry)
January 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Barry M Kaplan on behalf of Defendants Costco Wholesale Corporation, Richard A Galanti, W Craig Jelinek. (Kaplan, Barry)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 1/14/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 12/31/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/14/2019, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (KD)
November 6, 2018 Filing 2 Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendants Costco Wholesale Corporation, W Craig Jelinek, and Richard A Galanti. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(GT)
November 6, 2018 Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (GT)
November 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5532497) Attorney Roger M Townsend added to party James Johnson(pty:pla), filed by James Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Townsend, Roger)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Costco Wholesale Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W Craig Jelinek
Represented By: Barry M Kaplan
Represented By: Gregory Lewis Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: Barry M Kaplan
Represented By: Gregory Lewis Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard A Galanti
Represented By: Barry M Kaplan
Represented By: Gregory Lewis Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Johnson
Represented By: Roger M Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?