Johnson v. State of WA
Petitioner: Brian K Johnson
Respondent: State of WA and State of Washington
Case Number: 2:2018cv01630
Filed: November 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James P Donohue
Referring Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Filing 4 Mail addressed to Brian Johnson returned as Undeliverable re #2 IFP Deficiency Letter. (Per KCJ inmate list, plaintiff was released from their custody on 11/15/18) (ST)
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 LETTER mailed re IFP deficiency; - The filing fee requirement must be met. Please submit either the full $5.00 filing fee or an application for In Forma Pauperis (IFP) status.- Please provide a certified copy of your prison trust account statement showing transactions for the last six months. Filer has until 12/10/2018 to correct (SG)
November 6, 2018 Filing 1 PROPOSED 2254 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by Petitioner Brian K Johnson (NO FILING FEE, NO IFP) (SG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. State of WA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brian K Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of WA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?