Ashby v. United States of America
Petitioner: Jessica L Ashby
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2018cv01655
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 CJA 20: Appointment of Attorney Scott J Engelhard for Jessica L Ashby. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing electronic service upon the U.S. Attorney on 12/19/2018 re: Petitioner's #1 Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence and supporting documents; granting Petitioner's #4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM) cc: petitioner via first class mail; S. Haas Mag Clerks via email.
November 15, 2018 Filing 2 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (SG)
November 13, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Petitioner Jessica L Ashby. (SG)
November 13, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255), related to criminal case: 17-CR-111-JCC., filed by Jessica L Ashby.(SG) (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/15/2018) (SG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashby v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jessica L Ashby
Represented By: Scott J Engelhard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Mark P Parrent
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Joseph C. Silvio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?