Milkovich et al v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Lisa Milkovich and Dang Nguyen
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2018cv01658
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER granting #6 consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The United States answer, or other response to the Complaint, shall bedue on March 16, 2019. signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein.(HR)
January 9, 2019 Filing 6 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond, filed by Defendant United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/9/2019, (Cerling, Dylan)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: At counsel for plaintiff's request, the initial scheduling deadlines are continued as follows: FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 2/8/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/15/2019, Joint Status Report due by 2/22/2019. Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (LW)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 1/22/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/8/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/15/2019, by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (LW)
November 16, 2018 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to on 11/16/2018, filed by Plaintiffs Lisa Milkovich, Dang Nguyen. (Weil, Kenneth)
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant United States of America (GT)
November 16, 2018 Judge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (GT)
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Income Tax Refund against defendant(s) Lisa Milkovich, Dang Nguyen United States of America (Receipt # 0981-5545138) Attorney Kenneth C. Weil added to party Lisa Milkovich(pty:pla), Attorney Kenneth C. Weil added to party Dang Nguyen (pty:pla), filed by Lisa Milkovich, Dang Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Weil, Kenneth) Modified on 11/20/2018 to correctly identify defendant (KB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Milkovich et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Milkovich
Represented By: Kenneth C. Weil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dang Nguyen
Represented By: Kenneth C. Weil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?