Garcia v. State of Washington

Petitioner: Joaquin Garcia
Respondent: State of Washington
Case Number: 2:2018cv01663
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: Washington Western District Court
0 Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
1 Judge: Mary Alice Theiler
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/14/2019, (ST)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order 9 ORDER DECLINING TO SERVE #8 2254 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND AND DENYING MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (cc: petitioner w/amended 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus form)(ST)
December 14, 2018 8 2254 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, filed by Joaquin Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(ST)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (cc: petitioner via USPS)(ST)
December 13, 2018 6 LETTER from Joaquin Garcia (ST)
December 10, 2018 5 EXHIBIT re Dkt 3-1 Proposed 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Joaquin Garcia (ST)
December 3, 2018 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Joaquin Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Petition for Writ Of Habeas Corpus, #2 Proposed Motion for Appointment of Counsel, #3 Prison Trust Account Statement)(SG)
December 3, 2018 IFP deficiency corrected (SG)
November 28, 2018 3 EXHIBIT re #1 Proposed 2254 Petition, #2 IFP Deficiency Letter, filed by Petitioner Joaquin Garcia. (ST) Modified on 12/12/2018 to more accurately reflect type of document(s) filed. (ST)
November 16, 2018 2 LETTER mailed re IFP deficiency; - The proper IFP form was not submitted. Enclosed please find the correct IFP form to be filled out in full and returned to the Court.- Please provide a certified copy of your prison trust account statement showing transactions for the last six months. Filer has until 12/17/2018 to correct (ST)
November 15, 2018 1 PROPOSED 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Petitioner Joaquin Garcia (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED Motion for Appointment of Counsel)(ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. State of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joaquin Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?